EP4080100 - HORIZONTAL PROTECTIVE DEVICE FOR WALL MOUNT OF MEDICAL DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maquet (Suzhou) Co. Ltd. No.158 Fangzhou Road Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215024 / CN | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Qing No. 158 Fangzhou Road, Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215024 / CN | 02 /
XUAN, Jin No. 158 Fangzhou Road, Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215024 / CN | 03 /
LI, Qunhua No. 158 Fangzhou Road, Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215024 / CN | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20902085.8 | 18.06.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020CN96748 | Priority number, date | CN201911324026 | 20.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911324026 | [2022/43] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021120557 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4080100 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F16M11/12, F16M13/02, A61B50/28 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
F16M13/027 (EP,US);
F16M11/123 (CN);
A61B50/28 (US);
F16M11/125 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/43] | F16M11/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | HORIZONTALE SCHUTZVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE WANDHALTERUNG EINES MEDIZINISCHEN DISPLAYS | [2022/43] | English: | HORIZONTAL PROTECTIVE DEVICE FOR WALL MOUNT OF MEDICAL DISPLAY | [2022/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION HORIZONTAL POUR UN SUPPORT MURAL D'UN DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE MÉDICAL | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2022 | Translation filed | 20.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 12.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN201173371Y (SHANGHAI SIEMENS MEDICAL EQUIP [CN]); | [A]CN205877623U (XI'AN SUANIER ELECTRONIC TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN108150778 (UNIV XIDIAN) | International search | [X]CN201173371Y (SHANGHAI SIEMENS MEDICAL EQUIP [CN]); | [A]CN104390110 (UNIV NANJING AERONAUTICS); | [A]CN106233092 (DYNAMIC PERSPECTIVE GMBH); | [A]CN205877623U (XI'AN SUANIER ELECTRONIC TECH CO LTD); | [A]US2017254473 (KATZ GENE I [US]); | [PX]CN110836312 (MAQUET SUZHOU CO LTD) |