EP4079668 - AUTOMATIC METHOD FOR SPLICING PREPARATION AND SYSTEM FOR CARRYING OUT SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M. Torres Diseños Industriales, S.A. Ctra. Huesca, km. 9 31119 Torres de Elorz (Navarra) / ES | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORRES MARTINEZ, Manuel (deceased) / ES | [2024/15] |
Former [2022/43] | 01 /
TORRES MARTINEZ, Mikel (deceased) / ES | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20902194.8 | 11.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020ES70784 | Priority number, date | ES20190031114 | 17.12.2019 Original published format: ES 201931114 | [2022/43] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021123474 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | ES | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4079668 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 24.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/10 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
B65H19/102 (EP);
B65H19/1852 (ES,US);
B25J13/08 (US);
B25J9/1697 (US);
B65H2301/46115 (EP,US);
B65H2301/46171 (EP);
B65H2301/4622 (EP);
B65H2301/4631 (EP,US);
B65H2406/311 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/43] | B65H19/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR SPLEISSHERSTELLUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2022/43] | English: | AUTOMATIC METHOD FOR SPLICING PREPARATION AND SYSTEM FOR CARRYING OUT SAME | [2022/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ AUTOMATIQUE DE PRÉPARATION D'ÉPISSAGE ET SYSTÈME POUR SA MISE EN OEUVRE | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2022 | Translation filed | 15.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2022 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 02.09.2022 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/43] | 15.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0780331 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1,2,8 * column 1, lines 1-9 * * column 3, lines 23-30 * * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 23 * * column 7, lines 20-32 * * figures 4-6 * [A] 3-7,9-13; | [A]DE102015208126 (KRONES AG [DE]) [A] 1,8 * paragraphs [0011] , [ 0022] , [0025] , [ 0028] , [ 0050] , [ 0063] - [0065] ** figures 3, 5, 6 *; | [XAI]US2019168981 (LEUFSTADIUS EMANUEL [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,8,11-13 * paragraphs [0001] - [0002] - [ 0033] - [0034] - [ 0043] , [ 0047] - [0050] - [ 0052] - [0056] * * paragraphs [0060] - [0066] - [ 0070] , [ 0079] * * figures 1-4 * [A] 4-7,10 [I] 3,9 | International search | [X]EP0780331 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1-3, 8 * , Abstract; figures *; | [A]US5902448 (STETTNER GERD ERICH [DE]) [A] 1* , Abstract; figures *; | [A]WO0040195 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1 * , Abstract; figures *; | [A]EP1944258 (JOA CURT G INC [US]) [A] 1-7 * , Abstract; figures *; | [A]US2012211142 (CASEY DAVID W [US], et al) [A] 1 * , Abstract; figures *; | [A]US2018194577 (GROSS BRIAN [US], et al) [A] 8-12 * , Abstract; figures * | by applicant | US4821971 | US5322230 | US5386751 | US5902448 |