EP4079172 - FLEXIBLE HEATING ELEMENT, FABRICATION METHOD THEREFOR, FLEXIBLE HEATING ASSEMBLY THEREOF, AND AEROSOL GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 21.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Smoore Technology Limited No. 16 Dongcai Industrial Park Gushu Town Xixiang Street Baoan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518102 / CN | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Hongming 16 , Dongcai Industrial Park Gushu Town, Xixiang Street, Baoan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518102 / CN | 02 /
CHENG, Zhenqian 16 , Dongcai Industrial Park Gushu Town, Xixiang Street, Baoan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518102 / CN | 03 /
XIAO, Junjie 16 , Dongcai Industrial Park Gushu Town, Xixiang Street, Baoan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518102 / CN | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner, Patentanwälte mbB Werinherstraße 79 81541 München / DE | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20902306.8 | 13.10.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020CN120691 | Priority number, date | CN201911327773 | 20.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911327773 | [2022/43] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021120802 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4079172 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A24F40/46, A24F40/70, H05B3/10, H05B3/34, H05B3/36, H05B3/42, // A24F40/20 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
A24F40/46 (EP,US);
H05B3/36 (EP,US);
A24F40/70 (EP,US);
H05B3/10 (EP);
H05B3/12 (US);
H05B3/34 (EP);
H05B3/42 (EP);
A24F40/20 (EP);
H05B2203/003 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/43] | A24F40/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | BIEGSAMES HEIZELEMENT, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR, BIEGSAME HEIZANORDNUNG UND AEROSOLGENERATOR | [2022/43] | English: | FLEXIBLE HEATING ELEMENT, FABRICATION METHOD THEREFOR, FLEXIBLE HEATING ASSEMBLY THEREOF, AND AEROSOL GENERATOR | [2022/43] | French: | ÉLÉMENT CHAUFFANT FLEXIBLE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, ENSEMBLE CHAUFFANT FLEXIBLE ASSOCIÉ, ET GÉNÉRATEUR D'AÉROSOL | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2022 | Translation filed | 04.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 21.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US5408574 (DEEVI SEETHARAMA C [US], et al) [I] 1-13,15 * column 2, line 7 - column 10, line 48; figures 1-18 * [A] 14; | [A]CN106028486 (SHANGHAI COPIOUS OPTICAL S&T CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0106]; figure 1 *; | [XAI]WO2016184978 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO INVESTMENTS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,14,15 * page 7, line 2 - page 28, line 13; figures 1-6 * [A] 8-13[I] 2-7; | [A]CN106579564 (UNIV XIANGTAN) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0205]; figures 1-7 *; | [XAI]US2018093455 (ZOU JIANHUA [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0068]; figures 1-4 * [A] 14,15 [I] 2-13; | [XAI]CN108513378 (UNIV ELECTRONIC SCI & TECH CHINA) [X] 1,4,8 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0063]; figures 1-5 * [A] 14,15 [I] 2,3,5-7,9-13 |