EP4080258 - OPTICAL TERMINAL BOX FOR DISTRIBUTING OPTICAL POWER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 08.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Furukawa Electric Latam S.A. Rua Hasdrubal Bellegard 820 Cidade Industrial 81460-120 Curitiba - PR / BR | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PASETTI, Gabriel Tanner Rua Capiberibe, 971 - Santa Quitéria 80310-170 Curitiba - PR / BR | 02 /
CHIRON, Xavier Benoit Stéphane Rua Silva Jardim, 2903, Ap.03, Água Verde 80240-020 Curitiba - PR / BR | 03 /
DA CRUZ, Marcelo Silva Rua Carlos Garibaldi Biazetto, nº 251, sobrado 6 Boa Vista 82560-400 Curitiba - PR / BR | 04 /
DE LIMA, João Filipe Alves Rua Alberto Kosop, 280, Ap. 25B, Pinheirinho 81150-315 Curitiba - PR / BR | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Clarke, Modet y Cía., S.L. C/ Suero de Quiñones 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2022/43] | Clarke Modet & Co. C/ Suero de Quiñones 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 20902398.5 | 18.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020BR50570 | Priority number, date | BR20191027520 | 20.12.2019 Original published format: BR102019027520 | [2022/43] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021119792 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | PT | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4080258 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | BR | 24.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
G02B6/44465 (EP,BR);
G02B6/4452 (US);
G02B6/4442 (BR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | OPTISCHER ANSCHLUSSKASTEN ZUR VERTEILUNG OPTISCHER LEISTUNG | [2022/43] | English: | OPTICAL TERMINAL BOX FOR DISTRIBUTING OPTICAL POWER | [2022/43] | French: | BOÎTIER DE TERMINAISON OPTIQUE POUR DISTRIBUTION DE PUISSANCE OPTIQUE | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2022 | Translation filed | 19.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 19.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 03.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]KR20050069469 (KT CORP [KR]); | [Y]JP2010122527 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, et al); | [A]KR20100071468 (KT CORP [KR]); | [Y]WO2011094327 (AFL TELECOMMUNICATIONS LLC [US], et al); | [Y]US8488934 (ZHOU JUNSHENG [CN], et al); | [Y]US8768134 (PUETZ CURTIS LEE [US], et al); | [Y]KR101480760B (BE DREAMS COMPANION [KR]); | [Y]WO2015158121 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [Y]US9261663 (LOEFFELHOLZ TODD [US], et al); | [Y]WO2018048803 (CORNING RES AND DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION [US]); | [Y]US10031305 (LEEMAN SAMUEL [BE], et al); | [Y]CN108710184 (SICHUAN TIANYI COMHEART TELECOM CO LTD) | by applicant | US2009324189 | US2010202745 | EP3093698 | WO2017001893 | US9885846 |