EP3951577 - PROMPTING METHOD, TERMINAL, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Anni ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/06] | 01 /
HU, Anni Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2022/06] | Application number, filing date | 20902433.0 | 18.06.2020 | [2022/06] | WO2020CN96759 | Priority number, date | CN201911328642 | 20.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911328642 | [2022/06] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021120559 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3951577 | Date: | 09.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 24.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, G06F1/14, G06F3/0481, G06F3/01, G06Q10/109 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
G06Q10/109 (EP,CN,KR);
G06F3/04847 (CN,KR);
G06F1/1677 (EP,US);
G06F1/14 (EP);
G06F1/1652 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/1681 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/34] | G06F1/16, G06F1/14, G06F3/0481, G06F3/01, G06Q10/10 | ||
Former IPC [2022/06] | G06F3/0484 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] | Title | German: | AUFFORDERUNGSVERFAHREN, ENDGERÄT UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/06] | English: | PROMPTING METHOD, TERMINAL, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INVITE, TERMINAL, ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2022/06] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2021 | Translation filed | 02.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 26.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2017102786 (XU BEN [CN]) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraphs [0053] , [0064] - [0066] *; | [A]CN107831895 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD) [A] 4-7* paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0070]; figures 2a,2b *; | [I]CN109491230 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0064]; claim 1 * | International search | [Y]CN103853541 (LENOVO BEIJING LTD) [Y] 4-7, 9-10 * description, paragraphs 0088-0133 *; | [A]CN104423553 (BEIJING SAMSUNG TELECOM R&D CT, et al) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [X]CN105138187 (LENOVO BEIJING CO LTD) [X] 1-3,8,9-10 * description, paragraphs 0051-0071, 0124 *; | [Y]CN105138187 (LENOVO BEIJING CO LTD) [Y] 4-7, 9-10 * description, paragraphs 0051-0071, 0124 *; | [A]US2018275763 (KIM DAE-MYUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-10* entire document * |