EP4033631 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR UPDATING CURRENT PATTERN FOR RAPID CHARGING, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM, STORED IN STORAGE MEDIUM, FOR PERFORMING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.09.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG ENERGY SOLUTION, LTD. Tower 1, 108 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAM, Gi Min LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
OH, Song Taek LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
JOE, Won Tae LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
IM, Eun Seong LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
JUNG, Jae Min LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 06 /
LEE, Ko Woon LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/30] | Application number, filing date | 20902599.8 | 01.07.2020 | [2022/30] | WO2020KR08568 | Priority number, date | KR20190171205 | 19.12.2019 Original published format: KR 20190171205 | [2022/30] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021125475 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4033631 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, G01R31/389 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
H02J7/00712 (EP,KR);
G01R31/389 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H02J7/007182 (US);
G01R31/3842 (EP,CN,US);
H02J7/0047 (EP);
H02J7/0048 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR AKTUALISIERUNG VON STROMMUSTERN FÜR SCHNELLES LADEN SOWIE EIN IN EINEM SPEICHERMEDIUM GESPEICHERTES COMPUTERPROGRAMM ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DAVON | [2022/30] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR UPDATING CURRENT PATTERN FOR RAPID CHARGING, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM, STORED IN STORAGE MEDIUM, FOR PERFORMING SAME | [2022/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE METTRE À JOUR UN MOTIF DE COURANT POUR UNE CHARGE RAPIDE ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE, STOCKÉ DANS UN SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE, POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DE CELUI-CI | [2022/30] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2022 | Translation filed | 20.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 10.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2018076633 (FUJITA YUMI [JP], et al); | [A]WO2019199058 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | International search | [Y]JP3676134B [Y] 4-5,9-10 * See paragraph [0031] and claim 1. *; | [A]JP2016023967 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD) [A] 1-16* See paragraphs [0029]-[0030]. *; | [A]JP2017017907 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD) [A] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0054]-[0055]. *; | [AX]KR20170086876 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 6-8,11-13,16 * See paragraphs [0029] and [0040]. * [X] 1-3,14-15; | [A]JP2018186101 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD) [A] 1-16 * See paragraphs [0031]-[0054]. * |