EP4076693 - LOCATION DETERMINATION AND MAPPING WITH 3D LINE JUNCTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Niantic, Inc. One Ferry Building Suite 200 San Francisco, CA 94111 / US | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EKKATI, Anvith c/o Niantic, Inc. One Ferry Building, Suite 200 San Francisco, California 94111 / US | 02 /
YUAN, Rong c/o Niantic, Inc. One Ferry Building, Suite 200 San Francisco, California 94111 / US | 03 /
JAIN, Siddhant c/o Niantic, Inc. One Ferry Building, Suite 200 San Francisco, California 94111 / US | 04 /
HU, Si ying Diana c/o Niantic, Inc. One Ferry Building, Suite 200 San Francisco, California 94111 / US | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Cross, James Peter Archibald, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/43] | Poskett, Oliver James, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | Application number, filing date | 20902667.3 | 18.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020IB62238 | Priority number, date | US201962952016P | 20.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962952016 P | [2022/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021124286 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4076693 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/60, A63F13/216, A63F13/213, G06T7/73, G06T7/579 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
G06T7/73 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/213 (KR);
A63F13/216 (KR);
A63F13/25 (KR,US);
A63F13/65 (KR);
G01C21/30 (EP);
G01C21/3602 (KR);
G01C21/3638 (KR);
G01C21/3867 (KR);
G06T7/579 (EP,KR);
G06V10/44 (EP,US);
G06V10/443 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | ORTSBESTIMMUNG UND KARTIERUNG MIT 3D-LINIENVERBINDUNGEN | [2022/43] | English: | LOCATION DETERMINATION AND MAPPING WITH 3D LINE JUNCTIONS | [2022/43] | French: | DÉTERMINATION ET CARTOGRAPHIE DE POSITION À L'AIDE D'INTERSECTIONS DE LIGNES 3D | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 19.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - LARA CARLOS ET AL, Robust Local Localization of a Mobile Robot in Indoor Environments Using Virtual Corners, SAT 2015 18TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, AUSTIN, TX, USA, SEPTEMBER 24-27, 2015; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE; LECT.NOTES COMPUTER], SPRINGER, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 901 - 910, (20071113), ISBN 978-3-540-74549-5, XP047467811 [X] 1,2,4,12,13 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * sections 1,2.1,2.2,3,4 * [I] 3,5-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-540-76725-1_93 | [A] - HYUNWOO KIM ET AL, "A novel line matching method based on intersection context", 2010 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION : ICRA 2010 ; ANCHORAGE, ALASKA, USA, 3 - 8 MAY 2010, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100503), ISBN 978-1-4244-5038-1, pages 1014 - 1021, XP031743407 [A] 1-13 * abstract * * figure 8 * * page 1020, column R, paragraph 2 * | International search | [Y]KR20140058861 (KOREA INST SCI & TECH [KR]) [Y] 3,5-9,10-11,14,16-19; | [Y]US2015084951 (BOIVIN SAMUEL [FR], et al) [Y] 9 * paragraphs [0053]-[0054] *; | [A]JP2015194373 (DENSO IT LAB INC) [A] 1-20* paragraphs [0022]-[0092]; and figures 3-17 *; | [Y]WO2015192117 (MAGIC LEAP INC [US]) [Y] 3,5-8,10-11,14,16-19 * paragraphs [0020]-[1840]; and figures 29-37 *; | [A]JP2019101256 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0010]-[0042]; and figures 1-17 * |