Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
22.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
22.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
10.02.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
09.02.2024 | Change - classification | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
09.02.2024 | Change - classification | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
25.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.02.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 29.03.2023 [2023/13] |
24.02.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 29.03.2023 [2023/13] |
23.12.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.09.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.10.2022 [2022/41] |
09.09.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 12.10.2022 [2022/41] |
08.09.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.08.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.07.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.07.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
05.07.2022 | Change - representative | |
05.07.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.06.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.06.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |