Designated contracting states | AL | | AT | | BE | | BG | | CH | | CY | | CZ | | DE | | DK | | EE | | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | | HR | | HU | | IE | | IS | | IT | | LI | | LT | | LU | | LV | | MC | | MK | | MT | | NL | | NO | | PL | | PT | | RO | | RS | | SE | | SI | | SK | | SM | | TR | | Examination procedure | 22.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2022 | Translation filed | | 05.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | | 05.07.2022 | Search fee paid | | 05.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 05.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 25.06.2021 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE INTERNATIONAL PUBLICATION HAS BEEN MADE | | Event date: | 09.09.2022 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 09.09.2022 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE | | Event date: | 12.10.2022 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20220705 | | Event date: | 12.10.2022 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | | Event date: | 29.03.2023 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED) | | Event date: | 29.03.2023 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED) | | Event date: | 13.03.2024 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H01M 50/403 20210101AFI20240205BHEP | | Event date: | 13.03.2024 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H01M 50/446 20210101ALI20240205BHEP | | Event date: | 13.03.2024 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H01M 50/449 20210101ALI20240205BHEP | | Event date: | 13.03.2024 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H01M 10/058 20100101ALI20240205BHEP | | Event date: | 13.03.2024 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H01M 10/052 20100101ALI20240205BHEP | | Event date: | 13.03.2024 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H01M 4/04 20060101ALI20240205BHEP | | Event date: | 13.03.2024 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H01M 50/46 20210101ALI20240205BHEP | | Event date: | 13.03.2024 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H01M 10/0525 20100101ALI20240205BHEP | | Event date: | 13.03.2024 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H01M 10/0569 20100101ALI20240205BHEP | | Event date: | 13.03.2024 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H01M 50/426 20210101ALI20240205BHEP | | Event date: | 13.03.2024 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H01M 50/443 20210101ALI20240205BHEP | | Event date: | 13.03.2024 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H01M 50/497 20210101ALI20240205BHEP | | Event date: | 13.03.2024 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H01M 10/44 20060101ALI20240205BHEP | | Event date: | 13.03.2024 | | Event description: | SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20240209 | |