EP4080529 - CONTACTLESS POWER FEEDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi 448-8661 / JP | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAYASHIKI, Yuusei c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya- city, Aichi 4488661 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Masaya c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya- city, Aichi 4488661 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI, Eisuke c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya- city, Aichi 4488661 / JP | 04 /
YAMAGUCHI, Nobuhisa c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya- city, Aichi 4488661 / JP | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20903470.1 | 04.12.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020JP45200 | Priority number, date | JP20190227044 | 17.12.2019 Original published format: JP 2019227044 | [2022/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021124924 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4080529 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01F38/14, H01F27/42, B60L53/122, B60M7/00, B60L53/126, B60L53/39, H02J50/12, H02J50/40, H02J50/70 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
H02J50/12 (EP,US);
B60L53/122 (EP);
B60L53/126 (EP);
B60L53/39 (EP);
B60M7/00 (EP);
H01F27/42 (EP);
H01F38/14 (EP,US);
H02J50/402 (EP,US);
H02J50/70 (EP,US);
H01F2038/146 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/43] | H01F38/14, H02J50/12, H02J50/40, H02J7/00, B60L53/122, B60M7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONTAKTLOSEN STROMVERSORGUNG | [2022/43] | English: | CONTACTLESS POWER FEEDING DEVICE | [2022/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION EN ÉNERGIE SANS CONTACT | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2022 | Translation filed | 17.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 17.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 21.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB2440571 (SPLASHPOWER LTD [GB]) [X] 1,3,4,6,9 * figure 3 * * corresponding description * [I] 2-10; | [XI]WO2013051361 (HITACHI MAXELL ENERGY LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9 * figures 5,6 * * corresponding description * [I] 2-10; | [XI]US2015362614 (OBAYASHI KAZUYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8,9 * figures 12-16,19,20 * * corresponding description * [I] 2-10; | [XI]US9680311 (BLOOD KRISTEN J [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,9 * figures 1,2,4,5,11-14 * * corresponding description * [I] 2-10; | [A]JP2019071719 (YT CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,17 ** corresponding description * | International search | [A]JP2013085350 (HITACHI MAXELL) [A] 1-10* [0 0 7 2 ] - [00 7 7 ], 5 *; | [A]JP2018186603 (DAIHEN CORP) [A] 1-10 * [0 0 5 9] - [0 0 6 7], 3-4 * | by applicant | JP2019071719 |