EP4079623 - SHIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Shipbuilding Co., Ltd. 3-1, Minatomirai 3-Chome Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 220-8401 / JP | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIDA, Toshinori c/o Mitsubishi Shipbuilding Co., Ltd., 3-1, Minatomirai 3-Chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-8401 / JP | 02 /
MORIMOTO, Shinsuke c/o Mitsubishi Shipbuilding Co., Ltd., 3-1, Minatomirai 3-Chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-8401 / JP | 03 /
OGATA, Toshio c/o Mitsubishi Shipbuilding Co., Ltd., 3-1, Minatomirai 3-Chome, Nishi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 220-8401 / JP | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20903905.6 | 08.09.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020JP33878 | Priority number, date | JP20190228783 | 19.12.2019 Original published format: JP 2019228783 | [2022/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021124620 | Date: | 24.06.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4079623 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B63B25/08, B63B25/12, F17C6/00 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
B63B25/14 (EP);
B63B27/24 (KR);
B63B25/16 (KR);
F17C13/004 (KR);
F17C6/00 (EP,KR);
F17C2201/0109 (EP);
F17C2201/035 (EP);
F17C2201/054 (EP);
F17C2205/0352 (EP,KR);
F17C2221/013 (EP,KR);
F17C2221/033 (EP);
F17C2223/0153 (EP);
F17C2223/0161 (EP);
F17C2223/033 (EP);
F17C2223/046 (EP);
F17C2225/0153 (EP);
F17C2225/033 (EP);
F17C2225/046 (EP);
F17C2270/0105 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | SCHIFF | [2022/43] | English: | SHIP | [2022/43] | French: | NAVIRE | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2022 | Translation filed | 14.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 21.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH1137396 (TOYO SEISAKUSHO KK); | [A]NO324883B (STATOIL ASA [NO]); | [A]WO2008097099 (KNUTSEN OAS SHIPPING AS [NO], et al); | [XI]WO2010103260 (RAM LNG HOLDINGS LTD, et al); | [A]US2011232767 (LIEM PIETER [MC], et al); | [A]KR101411481B ; | [A]EP3356723 (WAERTSILAE FINLAND OY [FI]) | International search | [Y]JPH04297392 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]JP2004125039 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [Y]WO2010103260 (RAM LNG HOLDINGS LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2013505173 ; | [A]KR20130057068 (SAMSUNG HEAVY IND [KR]) | by applicant | JP5769445B | JP20190228783 |