EP4012775 - PIXEL DRIVE CIRCUIT, DISPLAY PANEL, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | For all designated states Hefei Boe Joint Technology Co., Ltd. Block 15 Group-A Zone-E Of Industrial Park In Hefei New Station Xinzhan District Hefei Anhui 230012 / CN | [2022/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Meng Beijing 100176 / CN | 02 /
LI, Yongqian Beijing 100176 / CN | 03 /
XU, Chen Beijing 100176 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Dacheng Beijing 100176 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Jingquan Beijing 100176 / CN | 06 /
SUN, Shi Beijing 100176 / CN | [2022/24] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [2022/24] | Application number, filing date | 20904245.6 | 15.05.2020 | [2022/24] | WO2020CN90652 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021227064 | Date: | 18.11.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4012775 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/32 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
G09G3/3233 (EP,US);
G09G3/3266 (US);
G09G3/3275 (US);
H10K59/131 (EP);
G09G2300/0426 (EP);
G09G2300/0842 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/24] | Title | German: | PIXELSTEUERSCHALTUNG, ANZEIGETAFEL UND ELEKTRONISCHES GERÄT | [2022/24] | English: | PIXEL DRIVE CIRCUIT, DISPLAY PANEL, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2022/24] | French: | CIRCUIT D'ATTAQUE DE PIXEL, PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/24] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2021 | Translation filed | 29.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2021 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2021 | Examination requested [2022/24] | 21.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2015357383 (CHUNG JIN-KOO [KR], et al) [Y] 14 * par. 55, 69, 71. *; | [Y]US2017193876 (CHOI JEONG HYEON [KR], et al) [Y] 1-15 * Par. 6, 88, 111-114. Fig. 8-10 *; | [A]CN206364017U (YUNGU (GU'AN) TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2018061908 (SHIM JONGSIK [KR], et al) [X] 1-10* Fig. 3-5. *; | [Y]US2020066817 (KIM TAEHAN [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * Fig. 3-4. Par. 41-46, 75-76. *; | [X]US2020074938 (KIM HONGSUK [KR]) [X] 1-10 * Fig. 5-6. par. 57-63, 100-101. * | International search | [A]US2013208017 (GU BON-SEOG [KR], et al) [A] 1-18* entire document *; | [Y]CN106935619 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD) [Y] 1-18 * description, paragraphs 45-113, and figures 8-11 *; | [Y]CN206364017U (YUNGU (GU'AN) TECH CO LTD) [Y] 16, 17 * description, paragraphs 28-30, figure 2 *; | [Y]CN108269831 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD) [Y] 1-18 * description, paragraphs 32-90, and figures 1-4 *; | [A]CN110021627 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * entire document *; | [A]CN110416278 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1-18 * entire document *; | [Y]CN110858607 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD) [Y] 1-18 * description, paragraphs 47-51, figure 4 * |