EP4081218 - ORALLY DISSOLVING FORMULATIONS OF PRUCALOPRIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shilpa Medicare Limited 12-6-214/A1 Hyderabad Road Raichur, Karnataka 584135 / IN | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIRLA, Ritesh Vinod Shilpa Therapeutics Private Limited. Plot No: 118 Phase-III, IDA Cherlapally Hyderabad, 500051 / IN | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Lecca, Patricia S. Cabinet Lecca 21, rue de Fécamp 75012 Paris / FR | [2022/44] | Application number, filing date | 20904499.9 | 23.12.2020 | [2022/44] | WO2020IB62370 | Priority number, date | IN201941053389 | 23.12.2019 Original published format: IN201941053389 | [2022/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021130684 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4081218 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IN | 01.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4525, A61P1/00, A61K9/00, A61K47/10, A61K47/26, A61K47/38, A61K47/40 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
A61K9/006 (EP,US);
A61K31/4525 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K47/26 (EP,US);
A61K47/38 (EP,US);
A61K47/40 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/44] | A61K31/4525, A61K9/20, A61P1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Title | German: | ORAL AUFLÖSBARE FORMULIERUNGEN VON PRUCALOPRID | [2022/44] | English: | ORALLY DISSOLVING FORMULATIONS OF PRUCALOPRIDE | [2022/44] | French: | FORMULATIONS ORODISPERSIBLES DE PRUCALOPRIDE | [2022/44] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 02.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 19.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2009099830 (MCNEIL PPC INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 3, line 9 - line 13 * * page 7, line 14 - line 16 * * page 22, line 15 - line 20 * * page 26, line 26 - page 28, line 4 *; | [XY]CN103070865 (BEIJING FUKANGREN BIOPHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-10 * the whole document * [Y] 1-10; | [Y]US2016220480 (BILAL MOBARIK [CA], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0006] , [0 10] , [0 14] , [0 27] - [0033] *; | [Y]WO2019202521 (SHILPA MEDICARE LTD [IN]) [Y] 1-10* the whole document * | International search | [XY]CN103070865 (BEIJING FUKANGREN BIOPHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1 *claim 4; para 10; paras 7-9; embodiment. 3; para 30; para 11* FAMILY: [NONE] * [Y] 2-10; | [Y]CN107595798 (JUMPCAN PHARMACEUTICAL PHARMACEUTICAL GROUP CO LTD) [Y] 2-10 *claims 1,4,6; para 16 FAMILY: [NONE] *; | [Y] - JOHNSON, DAVID E . et al., "THE 5 -HYDROXYTRYPTAMINE4 RECEPTOR AGONISTS PRUCALOPRIDE AND PRX-03140 INCREASE ACETYLCHOLINE AND HISTAMINE LEVELS IN THE RAT PREFRONTAL CORTEX AND THE POWER OF STIMULATED HIPPOCAMPAL T OSCILLATIONS", JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL, THERAPEUTICS, (20120000), vol. 341, no. 3, doi:10.1124/jpet.112.192351, pages 681 - 691, XP055100644 [Y] 8-10 *fig. 1; pg. 684, left col. last para* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/jpet.112.192351 |