EP4083237 - NANOCRYSTALLINE SOFT MAGNETIC ALLOY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Interruption | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tohoku Magnet Institute Co., Ltd. 11 Aza Kitaya Masuda Natori-shi, Miyagi 981-1224 / JP | For all designated states National Institute for Materials Science 2-1, Sengen 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0047 / JP | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMITA, Tatsuya c/o TOHOKU MAGNET INSTITUTE CO., LTD. 11 Aza Kitaya Masuda Natori-shi, Miyagi 981-1224 / JP | 02 /
NOMURA, Yohei c/o TOHOKU MAGNET INSTITUTE CO., LTD. 11 Aza Kitaya Masuda Natori-shi, Miyagi 981-1224 / JP | 03 /
UZUHASHI, Jun c/o NATIONAL INSTITUTE FOR MATERIALS SCIENCE 2-1, Sengen 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0047 / JP | 04 /
OHKUBO, Tadakatsu c/o NATIONAL INSTITUTE FOR MATERIALS SCIENCE 2-1, Sengen 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0047 / JP | 05 /
HONO, Kazuhiro c/o NATIONAL INSTITUTE FOR MATERIALS SCIENCE 2-1, Sengen 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0047 / JP | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2022/44] | Application number, filing date | 20904560.8 | 22.12.2020 | [2022/44] | WO2020JP47990 | Priority number, date | JP20190234390 | 25.12.2019 Original published format: JP 2019234390 | [2022/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021132254 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4083237 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C21D6/00, C22C45/02, C22C38/00, H01F1/153, C21D1/26, C21D9/46 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
C22C45/02 (EP,KR);
C22C38/16 (KR,US);
C21D6/00 (KR);
H01F1/153 (KR);
H01F1/15308 (EP);
H01F1/15333 (EP);
C21D1/26 (EP);
C21D2201/03 (EP);
C21D9/46 (EP);
C22C2202/02 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/44] | C21D6/00, C22C45/02, C22C38/00, H01F1/153 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Title | German: | NANOKRISTALLINE WEICHMAGNETISCHE LEGIERUNG | [2022/44] | English: | NANOCRYSTALLINE SOFT MAGNETIC ALLOY | [2022/44] | French: | ALLIAGE MAGNÉTIQUE DOUX NANOCRISTALLIN | [2022/44] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2022 | Translation filed | 24.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 30.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 25.12.2023 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2024/35] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010043927 (MAKINO AKIHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-11 * claims 1-15 * * figure 4 * * paragraphs [0023] , [0 28] , [0 56] - [0057] * * tables 2-7, 9-14, 20 *; | [X]CN101641455B (HITACHI METALS LTD) [X] 1-11 * claims 1-10 * * tables 1-3, 5-1, 5-2, 7, 9-1, 9-2 *; | [X]JP2012136770 (NEC TOKIN CORP) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0035] , [0 44] , [0 56] * * claims 1-9 ** table 2 *; | [X]JP2014075528 (NEC TOKIN CORP, et al) [X] 1-11 * claims 1-12 * * tables 1-3 * * paragraphs [0046] , [0 63] * | International search | [A]JPH01169905 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [A] 1-17 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]CN101834046 (NINGBO INST OF MATERIAL TECHNOLOGY AND ENGINEERING CHINESE ACADEMY OF SCIENCES) [A] 1-17* entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2010229466 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [A] 1-17 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2011149045 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [A] 1-17 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]WO2017022594 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2018073947 (TOHOKU MAGNET INST CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2019131853 (TDK CORP) [A] 1-17 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A] - JAFARI, S. et al., "Three-dimensional atom probe analysis and magnetic properties of Fe85CulSi2B8P4 melt spun ribbons", Journal of Magnetism and Magnetic Materials, (20151028), vol. 401, doi:10.1016/j.jmmm.2015.10.106, pages 1123 - 1129, XP029326053 [A] 1-17 * , entire text, all drawings * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmmm.2015.10.106 | by applicant | JPH0233352B | WO2010021130 | WO2011122589 | JP2011256453 | JP2013185162 | WO2017006868 |