EP3912714 - UNIFORM MIXING DEVICE OF CHILI RAW MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chongqing Dezhuang Agricultural Products Development Co., Ltd. No.10, Changdian Rd, Nan'an District Chongqing 401336 / CN | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Dejian No.10, Changdian Rd, Nan'an District Chongqing 401336 / CN | 02 /
LU, Shubang No.10, Changdian Rd, Nan'an District Chongqing 401336 / CN | 03 /
ZHAGN, Li No.10, Changdian Rd, Nan'an District Chongqing 401336 / CN | 04 /
ZHOU, Decai No.10, Changdian Rd, Nan'an District Chongqing 401336 / CN | 05 /
YUE, Qinsong No.10, Changdian Rd, Nan'an District Chongqing 401336 / CN | 06 /
LI, Yangmei No.10, Changdian Rd, Nan'an District Chongqing 401336 / CN | 07 /
TANG, Yi No.10, Changdian Rd, Nan'an District Chongqing 401336 / CN | [2024/39] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
LI, Dejian Chongqing 401336 / CN | ||
02 /
LU, Shubang Chongqing 401336 / CN | |||
03 /
ZHAGN, Li Chongqing 401336 / CN | |||
04 /
ZHOU, Decai Chongqing 401336 / CN | |||
05 /
YUE, Qinsong Chongqing 401336 / CN | |||
06 /
LI, Yangmei Chongqing 401336 / CN | |||
07 /
TANG, Yi Chongqing 401336 / CN | Representative(s) | Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB Wetterkreuz 3 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2021/47] | Application number, filing date | 20904770.3 | 14.12.2020 | [2021/47] | WO2020CN136159 | Priority number, date | CN201911359639 | 25.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911359639 | [2021/47] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021129441 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3912714 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3912714 | Date: | 25.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01F23/60, B01F29/81, B01F27/2122, B01F27/921, B01F35/71, B01F35/75 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
B01F23/60 (EP);
B01F29/85 (CN);
B01F27/921 (EP,US);
A23L19/01 (US);
B01F27/2122 (EP,CN);
B01F27/213 (US);
B01F27/92 (CN);
B01F29/81 (EP);
B01F35/71755 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/47] | B01F9/16, B01F7/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM GLEICHMÄSSIGEN MISCHEN VON CHILI-ROHMATERIAL | [2021/47] | English: | UNIFORM MIXING DEVICE OF CHILI RAW MATERIAL | [2021/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MÉLANGE UNIFORME DE MATIÈRE PREMIÈRE DE CHILI | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2021 | Translation filed | 16.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 04.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2171897 (HOUILLE ALAIN [FR]); | [A]CN107349856 (WANG ZHENHUI) |