EP4081065 - FOOTWEAR UPPER COMPRISING STRETCH ZONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 19.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lululemon Athletica Canada Inc. 1818 Cornwall Avenue Vancouver BC V6J 1C7 / CA | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOTRICA, Michael Andrew 1509A SW Hall St Portland, Oregon 97201 / US | 02 /
OLESON, Mark Arthur 3325 NE 29th Ave Portland, Oregon 97212 / US | 03 /
JOHNSTON, Donald Taylor 38 NW Davis Apt 626 Portland, Oregon 97209 / US | 04 /
LAM, Christopher Ka-Yin 1634 NW Everett St. Apt 102 Portland, Oregon 97209 / US | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | AWA Benelux AWA Benelux SA Tour & Taxis - Royal Depot box:216 Havenlaan 86c Avenue du Port 1000 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/44] | AWA Benelux Avenue Josse Goffin 158 1082 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 20904875.0 | 09.09.2020 | [2022/44] | WO2020CA51213 | Priority number, date | US201962953718P | 26.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962953718 P | [2022/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021127775 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4081065 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 01.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A43B23/02, A43B1/00, A43B9/00, A43D999/00 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
A43B23/0265 (EP,US);
A43B23/028 (US);
A43B1/00 (EP);
A43B23/0205 (US);
A43B23/0235 (EP,US);
A43B23/025 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Title | German: | SCHUHOBERTEIL MIT DEHNUNGSZONEN | [2022/44] | English: | FOOTWEAR UPPER COMPRISING STRETCH ZONES | [2022/44] | French: | TIGE DE CHAUSSURE COMPRENANT DES ZONES EXTENSIBLES | [2022/44] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 19.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2012055044 (DOJAN FREDERICK J [US], et al); | [XI]US2014317962 (SMITH TIMOTHY J [US], et al); | [XA]US2018325216 (TORONJO ALAN [US]) | International search | [A]US2006283042 (GREENE PAMELA S [US], et al) [A] 1-20* - Whole Document - *; | [A]WO2007030383 (NIKE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * - Whole Document - *; | [A]US2012255201 (LITTLE CAROL [US]) [A] 1-20 * - Whole Document - *; | [A]WO2014011912 (TAYLOR MADE GOLF CO [US]) [A] 1-20 * - Whole Document - *; | [A]US10376018 (RUSHBROOK THOMAS J [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * - Whole Document - * |