EP4060526 - TEXT PROCESSING METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jie Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHU, Guanwen Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 20905268.7 | 11.12.2020 | [2022/38] | WO2020CN135636 | Priority number, date | CN201911335070 | 23.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911335070 | [2022/38] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021129411 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4060526 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F40/232, // G06F40/242, G06F40/284, G06F40/30 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
G06N3/0464 (EP);
G06F16/35 (CN);
G06F40/284 (EP,US);
G06F40/166 (US);
G06F40/232 (EP);
G06F40/40 (US);
G06N3/045 (CN);
G06N3/048 (EP);
G06N3/084 (EP,CN);
G06F40/242 (EP);
G06F40/30 (EP);
G06N3/08 (US);
G06N3/09 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/38] | G06F17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] | Title | German: | TEXTVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG | [2022/38] | English: | TEXT PROCESSING METHOD AND DEVICE | [2022/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE TEXTE | [2022/38] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2022 | Translation filed | 14.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 20.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2010180198 (IAKOBASHVILI ROBERT [IL], et al); | [A]US2014281943 (PRILEPOV IURI [US], et al); | [A]CN107577668 (UNIV ELECTRONIC SCI & TECH CHINA) |