EP4084218 - ANTENNA ASSEMBLY AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. No.1, Vivo Road Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Pengpeng No.168 Jinghai East Rd., Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [2022/44] | Application number, filing date | 20905323.0 | 25.12.2020 | [2022/44] | WO2020CN139592 | Priority number, date | CN201911374802 | 27.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911374802 | [2022/44] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021129832 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4084218 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q9/42, H01Q1/24, H01Q5/328, H01Q5/35 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
H01Q1/243 (EP);
H01Q1/36 (CN,KR,US);
H01Q1/24 (US);
H01Q1/50 (CN,KR,US);
H01Q5/328 (EP);
H01Q5/35 (EP);
H01Q9/42 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/44] | H01Q1/36, H01Q1/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Title | German: | ANTENNENANORDNUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/44] | English: | ANTENNA ASSEMBLY AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2022/44] | French: | ENSEMBLE ANTENNE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/44] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2022 | Translation filed | 25.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 28.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN109149086 (AAC TECH NANJING INC); | [XA]CN109244665 (SHENZHEN HANYANG ANTENNA DESIGN CO LTD); | [XI]CN110165373 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | US2022311127 [ ] (LI YUANPENG [CN], et al) |