EP4082615 - INHIBITOR OF FERTILIZED EGG FRAGMENTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Center for Child Health and Development 2-10-1, Okura Setagaya-ku Tokyo 157-8535 / JP | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYADO, Kenji c/o National Center for Child Health and Development, 2-10-1 Okura, Setagaya-ku Tokyo 157-8535 / JP | 02 /
MIYAMOTO, Yoshitaka c/o National Center for Child Health and Development, 2-10-1 Okura, Setagaya-ku Tokyo 157-8535 / JP | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/44] | Application number, filing date | 20905606.8 | 25.12.2020 | [2022/44] | WO2020JP48973 | Priority number, date | JP20190238352 | 27.12.2019 Original published format: JP 2019238352 | [2022/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021132655 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4082615 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61P15/08, A61P43/00, C12N5/073, C12N5/075, C12N5/076, C12N1/00, C12N1/04, A61K31/4172, A61K31/555 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
A61P15/08 (EP);
A01N1/0221 (US);
A61K31/4164 (US);
A61K31/4172 (EP);
A61K31/555 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N5/0604 (EP,US);
C12N5/0609 (EP);
C12N5/061 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/44] | A61P15/08, A61P43/00, C12N5/073, C12N5/075, C12N5/076, C12N1/00, C12N1/04, A61K31/4172 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Title | German: | HEMMSTOFF FÜR BEFRUCHTETE EIERFRAGMENTIERUNG | [2022/44] | English: | INHIBITOR OF FERTILIZED EGG FRAGMENTATION | [2022/44] | French: | INHIBITEUR DE LA FRAGMENTATION D'OEUFS FERTILISÉS | [2022/44] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2022 | Translation filed | 30.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 09.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - ZULLO G ET AL, "L-ergothioneine supplementation during culture improves quality of bovinein vitro-produced embryos", THERIOGENOLOGY, LOS ALTOS, CA, US, (20151020), vol. 85, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.THERIOGENOLOGY.2015.10.008, ISSN 0093-691X, pages 688 - 697, XP029398992 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * * figure 3 * * Materials and methods * [Y] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.theriogenology.2015.10.008 | [XY] - MISHRA A. ET AL, "L-Ergothioneine improves the developmental potential of in vitro sheep embryos without influencing OCTN1-mediated cross-membrane transcript expression", ZYGOTE, GB, vol. 26, no. 2, doi:10.1017/S0967199418000047, ISSN 0967-1994, (20180401), pages 149 - 161, URL: http://dx.doi.org/10.1017/S0967199418000047, XP093105888 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * * figure 1 * * Materials and methods * [Y] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1017/S0967199418000047 | [XY] - NAJAFI ABOZAR ET AL, "Different concentrations of cysteamine and ergothioneine improve microscopic and oxidative parameters in ram semen frozen with a soybean lecithin extender", CRYOBIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC, US, (20140520), vol. 69, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.CRYOBIOL.2014.05.004, ISSN 0011-2240, pages 68 - 73, XP029044118 [X] 1-6,13 * the whole document * * tables 1-4 * * Materials and methods * [Y] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cryobiol.2014.05.004 | [XY] - GUIJARRO M V ET AL, "Effects of ergothioneine on diabetic embryopathy in pregnant rats", FOOD AND CHEMICAL TOXICOLOGY, PERGAMON, GB, (20021201), vol. 40, no. 12, doi:10.1016/S0278-6915(02)00177-1, ISSN 0278-6915, pages 1751 - 1755, XP002970586 [X] 1-5,13 * the whole document * * table 3 * * Materials and methods * [Y] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0278-6915(02)00177-1 | [XY] - WILLIAMSON RACHEL D. ET AL, "L-(+)-Ergothioneine Significantly Improves the Clinical Characteristics of Preeclampsia in the Reduced Uterine Perfusion Pressure Rat Model", HYPERTENSION, US, (20191223), vol. 75, no. 2, doi:10.1161/HYPERTENSIONAHA.119.13929, ISSN 0194-911X, pages 561 - 568, XP093039185 [X] 1-5,13 * the whole document * * figure 2 * * Materials and methods * [Y] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/HYPERTENSIONAHA.119.13929 | [XY] - MICHIAKI YAMASHITA ET AL, "Selenoneine, a Novel Selenium-Containing Compound, Mediates Detoxification Mechanisms against Methylmercury Accumulation and Toxicity in Zebrafish Embryo", MARINE BIOTECHNOLOGY, New York, (20130525), vol. 15, no. 5, doi:10.1007/s10126-013-9508-1, ISSN 1436-2228, pages 559 - 570, XP055523951 [X] 1-5,13 * the whole document * * figures 3, 10 * * Materials and methods * [Y] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10126-013-9508-1 | International search | [XY]US2010227307 (HAUSMAN MARVIN S [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 13 * claims, summary claims, summary * [Y] 2-5, 7, 8, 10-12; | [PX]US2020222351 (DHAMANE DHIRAJ [IN], et al) [PX] 1-13* claims, examples *; | [XY] - Çoyan Kenan; Bucak Mustafa Numan; Başpınar Nuri; Taşpınar Mehmet; Aydos Sena, "Ergothioneine attenuates the DNA damage of post-thawed Merino ram sperm", SMALL RUMINANT RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, NL, (19000101), vol. 106, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.smallrumres.2012.02.002, ISSN 0921-4488, pages 165 - 167, XP028933073 [X] 1-6, 9-13 * abstract, sections 2.3., 3., 4. abstract, sections 2.3., 3., 4. * [Y] 2-5, 7, 8, 10- 12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.smallrumres.2012.02.002 | [X] - Mayumi Tadanori, Kawano Hiroko, Kawai Yuichi, Hama Takao, "Studies on Ergothioneine. IX. Ergothioneine Stimulates Mouse Spermatozoa and Fertilization in vitro. (ergothioneine/fertilization/acrosome reaction/sperm penetration)", DEVELOPMENT GROWTH AND DIFFERENTIATION., Richmond, Vic. : Blackwell Publ. Asia, US, US, (19841201), vol. 26, no. 6, doi:10.1111/j.1440-169X.1984.00563.x, ISSN 0012-1592, pages 563 - 569, XP055834812 [X] 1-3, 13 * summary * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1440-169X.1984.00563.x | [X] - Yamini Asokan, N Sanjeeva Reddy, "Conservative effect of novel antioxidant L-Ergothioneine on the sperm functional and mitochondrial integrity in normozoospermic samples post thaw", American Journal of PharmTech Research, (20170000), vol. 7, no. 3, ISSN 2249-3387, pages 178 - 194, XP009529648 [X] 1-3, 13 * summary * | by applicant | JP2006160748 | WO2008007463 | JP4865083B | JP5231025B | JP5669056B | WO2015098380 | WO2016104437 | WO2017026173 | JP2019076039 | - Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20190000), vol. 58, pages 1 - 6 | - PLUSKAL T et al., PLoS One, (20140514), vol. 9, no. 5, page e97774 | - NAKAYAMA, T., Rinsho Fujinka Sanka, (20130000), vol. 67, no. 10, pages 1030 - 1037 | - J. Physiology and Pharmacology, (20110000), vol. 62, no. 4, pages 411 - 419 | - Fertility and Sterility, (20170000), vol. 107, no. 4, pages 882 - 896 |