EP4081875 - PEDESTRIANS WITH OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 14.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zoox, Inc. 1149 Chess Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAGWELL, Carden, Taylor c/o Zoox, Inc. 1149 Chess Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 02 /
DAS, Subhasis c/o Zoox, Inc. 1149 Chess Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 03 /
O'NEAL, Troy, Donovan c/o Zoox, Inc. 1149 Chess Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2022/44] | Application number, filing date | 20905627.4 | 14.12.2020 | [2022/44] | WO2020US64851 | Priority number, date | US201916726097 | 23.12.2019 Original published format: US201916726097 | US201916726042 | 23.12.2019 Original published format: US201916726042 | [2022/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021133582 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4081875 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 01.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, G06T7/10, G06F18/214, G06F18/22, G06F18/2413, G06V40/10, G06V20/58 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
G05D1/024 (EP);
G05D1/0088 (US);
G06F18/214 (EP);
G06F18/22 (EP);
G06F18/2413 (EP);
G06V20/58 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/44] | G05D1/02, G06K9/00, G06T7/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Title | German: | FUSSGÄNGER MIT GEGENSTÄNDEN | [2022/44] | English: | PEDESTRIANS WITH OBJECTS | [2022/44] | French: | PIÉTONS AVEC DES OBJETS | [2022/44] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 13.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2017079349 (ZOOX INC [US])[A] 1; | [A]US2019258737 (WANG ZENG [US], et al) [A] 1; | [I] - Spengler Martin ET AL, "Multi-Object Tracking: Explicit Knowledge Representation and Implementation for Complexity Reduction", (20020101), URL: https://citeseerx.ist.psu.edu/document?repid=rep1&type=pdf&doi=3e8d4c409bfb68af269781bc893968b3ccb97c33, (20231121), XP093103958 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - KOLLER-MEIER ESTHER B ET AL, "Tracking multiple objects using the Condensation algorithm", ROBOTICS AND AUTONOMOUS SYSTEMS, (20010228), vol. 34, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0921-8890(00)00114-7, ISSN 0921-8890, pages 93 - 105, XP085625748 [A] 1 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0921-8890(00)00114-7 | [A] - CRIST OBAL CURIO ET AL, "Walking Pedestrian Recognition", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INTELLIGENT TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20000901), vol. 1, no. 3, ISSN 1524-9050, XP011028374 [A] 1 | International search | [A]WO2012115920 (CROWN EQUIP CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 9-11, 15 * , claim *; | [A]WO2017079349 (ZOOX INC [US]) [A] 1-4, 9-11, 15* , claim *; | [A]US2019080184 (GERARDO CASTRO MARCOS PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 9-11, 15 |