EP4082942 - PROJECTION INSTRUCTION DEVICE AND PROJECTION INSTRUCTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 03.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIYAMA Takaaki Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
HAGIWARA Daisuke Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
TAKAGI Takefumi Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
TANAKA Koshi Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
IDERA Takaaki Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2022/44] | Application number, filing date | 20905941.9 | 27.11.2020 | [2022/44] | WO2020JP44356 | Priority number, date | JP20190238999 | 27.12.2019 Original published format: JP 2019238999 | [2022/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021131500 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4082942 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/137, B65G43/08, B07C7/00 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
B07C7/005 (EP);
B65G1/137 (US);
B65G1/1371 (EP);
B65G43/08 (EP,US);
B65G2209/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/44] | B65G1/137, B65G61/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Title | German: | PROJEKTIONSBEFEHLSVORRICHTUNG UND PROJEKTIONSBEFEHLSSYSTEM | [2022/44] | English: | PROJECTION INSTRUCTION DEVICE AND PROJECTION INSTRUCTION SYSTEM | [2022/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME D'INSTRUCTION DE PROJECTION | [2022/44] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2022 | Translation filed | 27.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 03.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JP5893809B (-) [Y] 4,9 * abstract * [A] 10; | [XAYI]EP3168799 (BERLINGER SYSTEM ENG GMBH [AT]) [X] 1-3,6-8 * pages 1-12; figures 1-5 * [A] 10 [Y] 4,9 [I] 5; | [A]JP2017185431 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1* abstract * | International search | [A]US7090134 (RAMSAGER THOMAS [US]) [A] 1-12; | [A]JP2007523811 (UNITED PARCEL SERVICE OF AMERICA, INC.) [A] 1-12; | [A]JP2013202667 (AMADA CO LTD) [A] 1-12; | [A]WO2015145982 (NEC CORP [JP])[A] 1-12; | [A]WO2017163711 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12; | [A]JP2017185430 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al) [A] 1-12; | [A]JP2017185431 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-12; | [A]JP2019117513 (CANON MARKETING JAPAN INC) [A] 1-12 | by applicant | US7090134 | JP20190238999 |