EP4062164 - CARBOHYDRATE POLYMER-BASED SENSOR AND METHOD FOR DEVELOPING THIS SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ege Universitesi Ege Universitesi Kampusu 35100 Izmir / TR | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONGUR, Gulsah Ege Universitesi Kampusu Eczacilik Fakultesi Bornova/Izmir / TR | 02 /
ERDEM GURSAN, Kadriye Arzum Ege Universitesi Kampusu Eczacilik Fakultesi Bornova/Izmir / TR | 03 /
EKSIN, Ece Ege Universitesi Kampusu Eczacilik Fakultesi Analitik Kimya Anabilim Dali 35100 Bornova/Izmir / TR | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/39] | Yalçiner Patent and Consulting Ltd. Tunus Caddesi 85/3-4 Kavaklidere Ankara / TR | Application number, filing date | 20906024.3 | 21.12.2020 | [2022/39] | WO2020TR51340 | Priority number, date | TR20190021857 | 26.12.2019 Original published format: TR 201921857 | TR20200002367 | 17.02.2020 Original published format: TR 202002367 | [2022/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021133339 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4062164 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | TR | 25.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/30, G01N33/53, G01N27/327 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
G01N27/308 (EP);
G01N27/3275 (EP);
G01N33/5308 (EP);
G01N2500/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/39] | G01N27/30, G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Title | German: | SENSOR AUF KOHLENHYDRATPOLYMERBASIS UND VERFAHREN ZUR ENTWICKLUNG DIESES SENSORS | [2022/39] | English: | CARBOHYDRATE POLYMER-BASED SENSOR AND METHOD FOR DEVELOPING THIS SENSOR | [2022/39] | French: | CAPTEUR À BASE DE POLYMÈRE GLUCIDIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉVELOPPEMENT DUDIT CAPTEUR | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 28.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - CONGUR GULSAH ET AL, "Chitosan modified graphite electrodes developed for electrochemical monitoring of interaction between daunorubicin and DNA", SENSING AND BIO-SENSING RESEARCH, (20190201), vol. 22, doi:10.1016/j.sbsr.2018.100255, ISSN 2214-1804, page 100255, XP055875866 [I] 1-12 * abstract * * Sections: 1, 2.1 to 2.3.6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.sbsr.2018.100255 | [A] - ÖNER EBRU TOKSOY ET AL, "Review of Levan polysaccharide: From a century of past experiences to future prospects", BIOTECHNOLOGY ADVANCES, ELSEVIER PUBLISHING, BARKING, GB, (20160510), vol. 34, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.BIOTECHADV.2016.05.002, ISSN 0734-9750, pages 827 - 844, XP029637381 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biotechadv.2016.05.002 | [A] - TOMULESCU CATERINA ET AL, "LEVAN -A MINI REVIEW", SCIENTIFIC BULLETIN. SERIES F. BIOTECHNOLOGIES, (20160101), vol. 20, XP093008493 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | [T] - CONGUR GULSAH ET AL, "Levan modified DNA biosensor for voltammetric detection of daunorubicin-DNA interaction", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B: CHEMICAL, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 326, doi:10.1016/J.SNB.2020.128818, ISSN 0925-4005, (20200831), (20200831), XP086327222 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.snb.2020.128818 | International search | [A]US2012222958 (POURMAND NADER [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * Description, page 5 para. [0074]; FIG. 1-27 *; | [A]JP2013066463 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-12* Abstract; FIG. 1-64 *; | [A]CN104777207 (UNIV WUHAN) [A] 1-12 * Abstract; FIG. 1-7 *; | [A]WO2017164982 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [A] 1-12 * Description; page 5, para. [0024], page 7, para. [0031]; FIG. 1-4 *; | [A] - GULSAH CONGUR et al., "Chitosan modified graphite electrodes developed for electrochemical monitoring of interaction between daunorubicin and DNA", Sensing and Bio-Sensing Research, (20190000), vol. 22, doi:https:// doi.org/ 10.1 0 16/j .sbsr.20 18.100255, ISSN 2214-1804, page 100255, XP055875866 [A] 1-12 * . * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.sbsr.2018.100255 | [A] - Eksin Ece, Zor Erhan, Erdem Arzum, Bingol Haluk, "Electrochemical monitoring of biointeraction by graphene-based material modified pencil graphite electrode", Biosensors and Bioelectronics, Amsterdam , NL , (20170601), vol. 92, doi:10.1016/j.bios.2017.02.016, ISSN 0956-5663, pages 207 - 214, XP055875868 [A] 1-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bios.2017.02.016 |