EP4082202 - MOTION ESTIMATION REGION FOR THE MERGE CANDIDATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Dajia Internet Information Technology Co., Ltd. Room 101D1-7, 1st Floor, Building 1 No.6, Shangdi West Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Yi-Wen Room 101D1-7, 1st Floor, Building 1 No. 6, Shangdi West Road Haidian District Beijing, 100085 / CN | 02 /
XIU, Xiaoyu Room 101D1-7, 1st Floor, Building 1 No. 6, Shangdi West Road Haidian District Beijing, 100085 / CN | 03 /
MA, Tsung-Chuan Room 101D1-7, 1st Floor, Building 1 No. 6, Shangdi West Road Haidian District Beijing, 100085 / CN | 04 /
JHU, Hong-Jheng Room 101D1-7, 1st Floor, Building 1 No. 6, Shangdi West Road Haidian District Beijing, 100085 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Xianglin 10524 Blue Granite Drive San Diego, CA 92127 / US | 06 /
YU, Bing Room 101D1-7, 1st Floor, Building 1 No. 6, Shangdi West Road Haidian District Beijing, 100085 / CN | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/44] | Application number, filing date | 20907248.7 | 23.12.2020 | [2022/44] | WO2020US66815 | Priority number, date | US201962953421P | 24.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962953421 P | [2022/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021133899 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4082202 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/52, H04N19/70, H04N19/96 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
H04N19/52 (EP,US);
H04N19/513 (CN);
H04N19/105 (US);
H04N19/109 (CN);
H04N19/159 (US);
H04N19/176 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/44] | H04N19/513, H04N19/70, H04N19/184, H04N19/109, H04N19/176 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Title | German: | BEWEGUNGSSCHÄTZBEREICH FÜR ZUSAMMENFÜHRUNGSKANDIDATEN | [2022/44] | English: | MOTION ESTIMATION REGION FOR THE MERGE CANDIDATES | [2022/44] | French: | RÉGION D'ESTIMATION DE MOUVEMENT DESTINÉE AUX CANDIDATS À LA FUSION | [2022/44] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 13.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2021104474 (MEDIATEK INC [CN]) [E] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [ 0070] * * paragraph [0140] - paragraph [0142] * * paragraph [0149] - paragraph [0150] * * paragraphs [0178] , [ 0197] *; | [Y] - JAINLE CHEN ET AL, "Algorithm description for Versatile Video Coding and Test Model 7 (VTM 7)", no. JVET-P2002-v1; JVET-P2002 ; m51516, (20191110), pages 1 - 90, 16. JVET MEETING; 20191001 - 20191011; GENEVA; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/16_Geneva/wg11/JVET-P2002-v1.zip JVET-P2002-v1.docx, (20191110), XP030224331 [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * Sections 2, 3.4.5 * | [Y] - ESENLIK (HUAWEI) S ET AL, "Non-CE4: Parallel Merge Estimation for VVC", no. JVET-L0216, (20181005), 12. JVET MEETING; 20181003 - 20181012; MACAO; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/12_Macao/wg11/JVET-L0216-v2.zip JVET-L0216.docx, (20181005), XP030251166 [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * Sections 1 and 3 * | [Y] - ESENLIK (HUAWEI) S ET AL, "Non-CE4: Parallel Merge Estimation for VVC", no. JVET-L0216, (20181005), 12. JVET MEETING; 20181003 - 20181012; MACAO; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/jvet/doc_end_user/documents/12_Macao/wg11/JVET-L0216-v2.zip JVET-K1001-v5_parallelMergeText.docx, (20181005), XP030251165 [Y] 1-9 * Sections 7.3.2.2 and 7.4.3.2 * | International search | [A]US2016219278 (CHEN YING [US], et al) [A] 1-17* claims 1-14 *; | [A]KR20170056594 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-17 * claims 1-8 *; | [A]KR20170108012 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * claims 1-8 *; | [A]WO2018099269 (MEDIATEK INC [CN]) [A] 1-17 * pages 2-4 *; | [A]US2018310017 (CHEN CHUN-CHIA [TW], et al) [A] 1-10 |