EP4082971 - LITHIUM-ION-CONDUCTIVE OXIDE SINTERED BODY AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 15.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Resonac Corporation 9-1, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2024/13] |
Former [2023/20] | For all designated states Resonac Corporation 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2022/44] | For all designated states Showa Denko K.K. 13-9, Shiba daimon 1-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEI, Ryosuke c/o SHOWA DENKO K.K., 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | 02 /
LEE, Kunchan c/o SHOWA DENKO K.K., 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2022/44] | Application number, filing date | 20907356.8 | 25.12.2020 | [2022/44] | WO2020JP48786 | Priority number, date | JP20190238567 | 27.12.2019 Original published format: JP 2019238567 | [2022/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021132582 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4082971 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C01G35/00, H01M4/62, H01M10/052, H01M10/0562, H01B1/06, H01B1/08, C04B35/447, C04B35/495, C01B25/45, C04B35/626, H01M10/0525 | [2024/05] | CPC: |
C04B35/447 (EP,KR);
H01M10/0562 (EP,KR,US);
C01B25/45 (EP,KR);
C04B35/495 (KR);
H01B1/08 (EP,KR);
H01M10/052 (KR);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M4/62 (KR);
C01P2002/60 (KR);
C01P2002/85 (KR);
C01P2004/61 (EP);
C01P2004/62 (EP);
C04B2235/3203 (EP);
C04B2235/3251 (EP);
C04B2235/3409 (EP);
C04B2235/3418 (EP);
C04B2235/6562 (EP);
C04B2235/6567 (EP);
C04B2235/6586 (EP);
C04B2235/76 (EP);
C04B2235/77 (EP,KR);
C04B2235/81 (EP);
C04B2235/85 (EP);
C04B2235/96 (KR);
C04B35/62615 (EP);
C04B35/62645 (EP);
H01M2300/0071 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/44] | C01G35/00, H01M4/62, H01M10/052, H01M10/0562, H01B1/06, H01B1/08, C04B35/447, C04B35/495 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Title | German: | LITHIUM-IONEN-LEITENDER OXID-SINTERKÖRPER UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2022/44] | English: | LITHIUM-ION-CONDUCTIVE OXIDE SINTERED BODY AND USE THEREOF | [2022/44] | French: | CORPS FRITTÉ D'OXYDE CONDUCTEUR D'IONS LITHIUM ET SON UTILISATION | [2022/44] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2022 | Translation filed | 24.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 15.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4009092 (TAYLOR BARRY EDWARD) [X] 1-5,7-11 * column 1; claim 10 ** column 5, line 12 - line 27; example 15 *; | [X]JP2006108026 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-5,7-11 * example 2; claim 8 *; | [E]EP4023594 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [E] 1-11 * paragraph [0024]; claims 1-5; table 1 * | International search | [A]JP2006108026 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-11; | [A]JP2016131125 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-11; | [A]JP2017168395 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-11; | [A]JP2018125286 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1-11; | [PX]CN111116198 (GUANGDONG TONBON TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-2, 8-11* claims, examples, 0027-0030 *; | [PX]US2020373613 (KIM RYOUNGHEE [KR], et al) [PX] 1-2, 8-11 * claims, examples * | by applicant | JP2016169145 | - J. KIM et al., J. Mater. Chem. A, (20180000), vol. 6, pages 22478 - 22482 | JP2016169145 | - J. KIM et al., J. Mater. Chem. A, (20180000), vol. 6, pages 22478 - 22482 |