EP4053471 - ELECTROCALORIC EFFECT ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIROSE, Sakyo c/o Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd., 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Thoma, Michael Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 20907429.3 | 13.08.2020 | [2022/36] | WO2020JP30807 | Priority number, date | JP20190231472 | 23.12.2019 Original published format: JP 2019231472 | [2022/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021131142 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4053471 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B32B18/00, H10N15/10, F25B21/00, C04B35/497, C04B35/64, // C04B35/626, C04B35/638 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
F25B21/00 (EP,US);
B32B18/00 (EP);
C04B35/497 (EP);
C04B35/64 (EP);
H10N15/15 (EP);
C04B2235/3224 (EP);
C04B2235/6567 (EP);
C04B2235/6587 (EP);
C04B2235/662 (EP);
C04B2235/768 (EP);
C04B2235/79 (EP);
C04B2235/80 (EP);
C04B2235/81 (EP);
C04B2235/95 (EP);
C04B2237/345 (EP);
C04B2237/704 (EP);
C04B35/6261 (EP);
C04B35/638 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/36] | F25B21/00, H01L37/02, C04B35/01, C04B35/497 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | ELEMENT MIT ELEKTROKALORISCHEM EFFEKT | [2022/36] | English: | ELECTROCALORIC EFFECT ELEMENT | [2022/36] | French: | ÉLÉMENT À EFFET ÉLECTROCALORIQUE | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2022 | Translation filed | 03.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 03.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 02.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2016194700 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [A] 1-5* paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0020] *; | [Y] - NAIR B ET AL, "Large electrocaloric effects in oxide multilayer capacitors over a wide temperature range", NATURE, (20191009), vol. 575, doi:10.1038/S41586-019-1634-0, pages 468 - 472, XP036928418 [Y] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41586-019-1634-0 | [ ] - Nair B. ET AL, "Large electrocaloric effects in oxide multilayer capacitors over a wide temperature range, Supplementary Information", Nature, doi:10.1038/s41586-019-1634-0, (20191009), pages 1 - 28, URL: https://doi.org/10.1038/s41586-019-1634-0, (20231020), XP093093441 [ ] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41586-019-1634-0 | [Y] - BRINKMAN K ET AL, "The Impact of chemical ordering on the dielectric properties of lead scandium tantalate Pb(Sc1/2Ta1/2)O3 thin films", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (20070823), vol. 102, doi:10.1063/1.2770834, ISSN 0021-8979, XP012101555 [Y] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.2770834 | [A] - CORREIA T M ET AL, "PST thin films for electrocaloric coolers", JOURNAL OF PHYSICS D: APPLIED PHYSICS, (20110407), vol. 44, no. 16, doi:10.1088/0022-3727/44/16/165407, ISSN 0022-3727, XP020188382 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0022-3727/44/16/165407 | International search | [A]JP2016021574 (YUUTEKKU KK)[A] 1-5; | [Y]WO2016194700 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * [0015]-[0021], [0041]-[0046], 1, 5 *; | [Y]JP2017110838 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO) [Y] 4 * [0018]-[0030], 1 *; | [Y]JP2017117910 (DAIHATSU MOTOR CO LTD, et al) [Y] 1-5 * [0008]-[0011] * | by applicant | - Ferroelectrics, (19960000), vol. 184, page 239 | - "Role of Defects in the Ferroelectric Relaxor lead Scandium Tantalate", J. Am. Ceram. Soc, (19950000), vol. 78, no. 71, pages 1947 - 52 |