Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
10.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
10.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
19.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.06.2023 | Supplementary search report | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
23.06.2023 | Change - classification | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
23.06.2023 | Change - classification | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
24.03.2023 | Change - classification | published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] |
24.03.2023 | Change - classification | published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] |
03.03.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 05.04.2023 [2023/14] |
03.03.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 05.04.2023 [2023/14] |
21.12.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.09.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] |
30.09.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] |
05.09.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.07.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
11.06.2022 | Change - representative | |
11.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.07.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.07.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |