EP4020947 - MOBILE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honor Device Co., Ltd. Suite 3401, Unit A, Building 6 Shum Yip Sky Park, No. 8089 Hongli West Road Xiangmihu Street, Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUO, Fan Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2022/26] | Application number, filing date | 20907802.1 | 29.10.2020 | [2022/26] | WO2020CN124892 | Priority number, date | CN201911349248 | 24.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911349248 | [2022/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021129131 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4020947 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4020947 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/02, H04M1/21, G06F1/16 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
H04M1/0266 (EP,CN);
H04M1/026 (EP,CN);
G06F1/1637 (EP);
H04M1/21 (CN);
H04M2250/12 (EP,CN)
|
Former IPC [2022/26] | H04M1/02, H04M1/21 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOBILES ENDGERÄT | [2022/26] | English: | MOBILE TERMINAL | [2022/26] | French: | TERMINAL MOBILE | [2022/26] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2022 | Translation filed | 24.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 03.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2023 | CZ | 06.09.2023 | DK | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | IT | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | MC | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SI | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | LU | 29.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
LU | 29.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
LU | 29.10.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
LU | 29.10.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
LU | 29.10.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2017160025 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-16 * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0073] * * figures 2B, 4A-4E *; | [A]WO2018196149 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-16 * See family document US2021397215A1 used as translation into one of the official languages of the EPO. *; | [Y]CN209805867U (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-16 * See family document US2021271295A1 used as translation into one of the official languages of the EPO. *; | US2021271295 [ ] (LI CHENLONG [CN], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0107] * * paragraph [0113] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0174] - paragraph [0180] * * paragraph [0185] * * paragraph [0199] - paragraph [0202] * * paragraph [0209] - paragraph [0210] * * figures 1A-4,16-20, 28,30 *; | US2021397215 [ ] (YIN BANGSHI [CN], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0194] ** figures 4-17,21 * |