EP4059612 - TARGET MATERIAL EXTRACTION KIT FOR CENTRIFUGAL SEPARATOR, AND METHOD FOR EXTRACTING TARGET MATERIAL BY USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 14.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glofinn Co., Ltd. 5, Gajeon 4-gil, Byeongcheon-myeon, Dongnam-gu Cheonan-si, Chungcheongnam-do 31253 / KR | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Hong 302-ho, 26 Seocho-daero 25-gil Seocho-gu Seoul 06588 / KR | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Loo, Chi Ching, et al Albright IP Limited County House Bayshill Road Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL50 3BA / GB | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 20907807.0 | 22.12.2020 | [2022/38] | WO2020KR18872 | Priority number, date | KR20190172784 | 23.12.2019 Original published format: KR 20190172784 | [2022/38] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021133024 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4059612 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B04B7/00, B04B11/00, B01L3/00, A61M1/36 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
B01L3/5021 (EP,US);
B04B7/00 (KR,US);
A61J1/05 (US);
A61M1/029 (EP);
A61M1/3693 (EP);
B01D17/0217 (EP);
B04B11/00 (KR,US);
G01N33/491 (EP,US);
B01L2200/025 (EP);
B01L2300/0832 (EP);
B01L2300/0841 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0409 (EP);
B01L2400/0478 (EP,US);
B01L3/5082 (US);
B01L3/5635 (EP);
G01N2030/8809 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/38] | B04B7/00, B04B11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] | Title | German: | ZIELMATERIALEXTRAKTIONSKIT FÜR ZENTRIFUGALSEPARATOR UND VERFAHREN ZUM EXTRAHIEREN VON ZIELMATERIAL DURCH VERWENDUNG DESSELBEN | [2022/38] | English: | TARGET MATERIAL EXTRACTION KIT FOR CENTRIFUGAL SEPARATOR, AND METHOD FOR EXTRACTING TARGET MATERIAL BY USING SAME | [2022/38] | French: | KIT D'EXTRACTION DE MATÉRIAU CIBLE POUR SÉPARATEUR CENTRIFUGE, ET PROCÉDÉ D'EXTRACTION DE MATÉRIAU CIBLE LE METTANT EN OEUVRE | [2022/38] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2022 | Translation filed | 16.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 10.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4269718 (PERSIDSKY MAXIM D) [X] 1,4 * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 43; figures 1-4 * [I] 2,3; | [A]KR100988221B (KIM JUN WOO [KR]) [A] 1-4* paragraphs [0008] - [0016] *; | [XI]US2012082652 (SENGUN MEHMET ZIYA [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * paragraphs [0046] - [0057]; figures 1-4 * [I] 2,3; | [XI]EP3470142 (ORTHOGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,4 * paragraphs [0055] - [0064]; figures 1-5 * [I] 2,3 | International search | [A]JP2008110272 (NIPRO CORP) [A] 1-4* See entire document. *; | [A]KR101162750B (SAE WON MEDITECH CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-4 * See entire document. *; | [Y]KR20120119262 (GLOTECH [KR]) [Y] 4 * See abstract; paragraphs [0044]-[0048]; and figures 18-21. *; | [Y]KR20130091514 (CHO HEE MIN [KR]) [Y] 3,4 * See abstract; paragraphs [0020]-[0034]; and figures 3-5. *; | [Y]KR20140141195 (KIM HONG [KR]) [Y] 3,4 | by applicant | KR101069877B | KR101557190B |