EP4083446 - VALVE MOUNTING MECHANISM, HYDRAULIC DEVICE, AND WORK MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 10.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUBOTA CORPORATION 1-2-47, Shikitsuhigashi Naniwa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 556-8601 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/44] | For all designated states KUBOTA CORPORATION 1-2-47, Shikitsuhigashi Naniwa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 556-8601 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMIYA Daisuke c/o KUBOTA CORPORATION Sakai Seizosho, 64, Ishizukitamachi, Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-0823 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIZUMI Masaaki c/o KUBOTA CORPORATION Sakai Seizosho, 64, Ishizukitamachi, Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-0823 / JP | 03 /
TAKADA Toshiki c/o KUBOTA CORPORATION Sakai Seizosho, 64, Ishizukitamachi, Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-0823 / JP | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2022/44] | Application number, filing date | 20908151.2 | 21.12.2020 | [2022/44] | WO2020JP47666 | Priority number, date | JP20190232042 | 23.12.2019 Original published format: JP 2019232042 | [2022/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021132152 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4083446 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F15B15/14 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
F15B15/202 (EP,US);
E02F9/2267 (EP,US);
E02F9/2271 (EP,US);
F15B15/14 (US);
F15B15/149 (EP);
E02F3/325 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Title | German: | VENTILMONTAGEMECHANISMUS, HYDRAULISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND ARBEITSMASCHINE | [2022/44] | English: | VALVE MOUNTING MECHANISM, HYDRAULIC DEVICE, AND WORK MACHINE | [2022/44] | French: | MÉCANISME DE MONTAGE DE SOUPAPE, DISPOSITIF HYDRAULIQUE ET MACHINE DE TRAVAIL | [2022/44] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2022 | Translation filed | 07.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 07.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | 09.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0972306 (YUTANI JUKO KK); | [XA]JP2005042867 (KUBOTA KK); | [XA]EP3220005 (KYB-YS CO LTD [JP]); | [A]WO2018228705 (FESTO AG & CO KG [DE]) | International search | [A]JP2005042867 (KUBOTA KK); | [A]JP2014205954 (KOBELCO CONSTR MACHINERY LTD); | [XA]JP2016094769 (KYB-YS CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2001295810 |