EP4083036 - HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUND, ORGANIC LIGHT-EMITTING ELEMENT COMPRISING SAME, COMPOSITION FOR ORGANIC LAYER OF ORGANIC LIGHT-EMITTING ELEMENT, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING ORGANIC LIGHT-EMITTING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LT Materials Co., Ltd. 113-19 Dangha-ro Namsa-eup Cheoin-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17118 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/44] | For all designated states LT Materials Co., Ltd. 113-19 Dangha-ro Namsa-myeon Cheoin-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17118 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Yong-Hui 113-19, Dangha-ro, Namsa-myeon,Cheoin-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17118 / KR | 02 /
MO, Jun-Tae 113-19, Dangha-ro, Namsa-myeon,Cheoin-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17118 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Dong-Jun 113-19, Dangha-ro, Namsa-myeon,Cheoin-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17118 / KR | [2022/44] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2022/44] | Application number, filing date | 20908347.6 | 21.12.2020 | [2022/44] | WO2020KR18832 | Priority number, date | KR20190174983 | 26.12.2019 Original published format: KR 20190174983 | [2022/44] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021133016 | Date: | 01.07.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4083036 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.08.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/14, C07D405/04, C07D409/04, C07D409/14, C07D471/04, C07D491/048, C07D495/04, H10K85/60, H10K101/10 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
C07D405/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D405/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D409/04 (EP,KR);
C07D409/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D471/04 (KR);
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
C07D491/048 (EP,KR,US);
C07D493/04 (US);
C07D495/04 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/11 (EP,KR);
H10K71/164 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/631 (EP,US);
H10K85/633 (EP);
H10K85/636 (EP);
H10K85/654 (US);
H10K85/657 (EP,US);
H10K85/6572 (EP,US);
H10K85/6574 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/6576 (EP,KR,US);
C07B2200/05 (US);
H10K2101/10 (EP);
H10K2101/90 (EP);
H10K50/12 (EP);
H10K71/00 (EP,KR);
H10K85/342 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/44] | C07D405/14, C07D405/04, C07D409/04, C07D409/14, C07D471/04, C07D491/048, C07D495/04, H01L51/00, H01L51/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/44] | Title | German: | HETEROCYCLISCHE VERBINDUNG, ORGANISCHES LICHTEMITTIERENDES ELEMENT DAMIT, ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR DIE ORGANISCHE SCHICHT EINES ORGANISCHEN LICHTEMITTIERENDEN ELEMENTS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ORGANISCHEN LICHTEMITTIERENDEN ELEMENTS | [2022/44] | English: | HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUND, ORGANIC LIGHT-EMITTING ELEMENT COMPRISING SAME, COMPOSITION FOR ORGANIC LAYER OF ORGANIC LIGHT-EMITTING ELEMENT, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING ORGANIC LIGHT-EMITTING ELEMENT | [2022/44] | French: | COMPOSÉ HÉTÉROCYCLIQUE, ÉLÉMENT ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE LE COMPRENANT, COMPOSITION POUR COUCHE ORGANIQUE D'ÉLÉMENT ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ÉLÉMENT ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE | [2022/44] | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2022 | Translation filed | 25.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2013135352 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 8,12-15* page 60; compounds CbzA1, MA1 *; | [IY]WO2016023608 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-15 * claims 1-15 * * page 40, compounds of the 2-nd row * * page 47, lines 3-7 * * page 71; compound j1 * [Y] 8,12-15; | [Y]US2019185411 (LEE MUN JAE [KR], et al) [Y] 8,12-15 * claims 1, formula 1 * | International search | [X]KR20180109747 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [X] 1-15 * See claims 1-9; paragraphs [0282], [0307], [0583]-[0585] and [0593]; and page 14, compound 216. *; | [X]KR20180109748 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [X] 1-15 * See claims 1-10; paragraphs [0365]-[0370]; and page 8, fifth line, sixth compound. *; | [A]KR101943428B (LT MATERIALS CO., LTD.) [A] 1-15 * See claims 1-17. *; | [X]KR20190120985 (LT MAT CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-7,9,10 * See claims 1-13; and page 14, compound 1241. *; | [A]WO2019212290 (DUK SAN NEOLUX CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15* See claims 1-15. * | by applicant | US4356429 | KR20190174983 |