EP4085208 - DESIGN FOR A SEAT INSERT IN A BALL VALVE FOR CRYOGENIC APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Corporation 31500 Solon Road Solon, OH 44139 / US | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUBOIS, Herman M. Oude Liersebaan 162 2570 Duffel / BE | 02 /
BURLOT, Philippe La ville au chevalier 22460 Le Quillio / FR | 03 /
KUSTERMANS, Jan Hogeheidelaan 1a 2960 Brecht / BE | 04 /
ROUSSEAU, Filip Antwerpsestraat 164 2845 Niel / BE | 05 /
CAGLIO, Simone Via Caimi 17/A 20833 Giussano / IT | 06 /
FERNANDEZ, Denis Rue de Savys 4 lotissement Les Sarmentelles 71680 Crêches sur Saône / FR | 07 /
VALDENAIRE, Christophe 15 rue des peupliers 34830 Clapiers / FR | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 20908732.9 | 04.12.2020 | [2022/45] | WO2020US63237 | Priority number, date | US201962955966P | 31.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962955966 P | US202062965379P | 24.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062965379 P | [2022/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021137995 | Date: | 08.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4085208 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F16K5/06, F16K25/00, F16K5/20, F16K27/06 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
F16K5/0668 (EP,US);
F16K5/201 (US);
F16K27/067 (EP);
F16K5/0689 (EP,US);
F16K5/204 (EP);
F16K5/0673 (US)
|
Former IPC [2022/45] | F16K5/06, F16K25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Title | German: | GESTALTUNG EINES SITZEINSATZES IN EINEM KUGELVENTIL FÜR KRYOGENE ANWENDUNGEN | [2022/45] | English: | DESIGN FOR A SEAT INSERT IN A BALL VALVE FOR CRYOGENIC APPLICATIONS | [2022/45] | French: | CONCEPTION POUR INSERT DE SIÈGE DANS UN ROBINET À TOURNANT SPHÉRIQUE POUR APPLICATIONS CRYOGÉNIQUES | [2022/45] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 04.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4071220 (IINO TSUYOSHI) [A] 1,8,9,13* figures 2A-C, 3 *; | [XAI]EP0120556 (MARWIN CONTROLS [GB]) [X] 1-8 * figures 1, 2 * [A] 9-13 [I] 14,15; | [XAI]US4673164 (NAKANISHI SADAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * figures 1, 3a, 3b, 4a * [A] 9-13 [I] 8,14,15; | [XAI]DE10022909 (ASG LUFTFAHRTTECHNIK UND SENSO [DE]) [X] 1-6,14 * paragraph [0021]; figures 1, 2 * [A] 8-13 [I] 7,15; | [XA]JP2007232019 (KITZ CORP) [X] 1-8,14,15 * Machine translation; paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1-3 * [A] 9-13; | [XI]WO2011071581 (CAMERON INT CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-9,12,14,15 * figures 1, 5 * [I] 10,11,13; | [XI]CN205026139U (ZHEJIANG ZHONGDE AUTOMATIC CONTROL VALVE CO LTD) [X] 1-6,8,9,12 * Machine translation; paragraph [0027]; figures 1, 2 * [I] 7,10,11,13-15 | International search | [A]US4658847 (MCCRONE JAMES A [US]) [A] 1-15* column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 38 and figures 1-2 *; | [A]JP2005048853 (KITZ CORP) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0016]-[0020] and figure 4 *; | [Y]JP2007232019 (KITZ CORP) [Y] 9-13; | [A]CN207122606U (DALIAN MARINE VALVE CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010]-[0011] and figures 1-2 *; | [Y]US9982789 (MIRCEA BALAN [US]) [Y] 9-13 * column 3, line 29 - column 4, line 14 and figures 1-3 * |