EP4085075 - COMPOSITION AND USE OF ENGINEERED MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES REFRACTORY TO TUMOR IMMUNO-SUPPRESSIVE FACTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 13.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Navrogen, Inc. 66 Mount Aire Farm Road Glen Mills, Pennsylvania 19342 / US | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NICOLAIDES, Nicholas C. 66 Mount Aire Farm Road Glen Mills, Pennsylvania 19342 / US | 02 /
GRASSO, Luigi 403 Barbara Lane Bryn Mawr, Pennsylvania 19010 / US | 03 /
KLINE, James Bradford 29 Lenape Drive Morgantown, Pennsylvania 19543 / US | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Tombling, Adrian George Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 20908988.7 | 29.12.2020 | [2022/45] | WO2020US67345 | Priority number, date | US201962955477P | 31.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962955477 P | [2022/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021138346 | Date: | 08.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4085075 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/30, C07K16/28, A61P35/00, G01N33/68, A61K39/00 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
C07K16/2887 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,IL,US);
A61K39/39558 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K14/705 (US);
C12N5/0693 (US);
G01N33/5011 (US);
A61K2300/00 (IL,KR);
A61K39/00 (US);
C07K2317/24 (US);
C07K2317/31 (KR,US);
C07K2317/55 (KR);
C07K2317/73 (KR);
C07K2317/732 (EP,IL);
C07K2317/92 (KR);
G01N2500/10 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K39/39558, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERWENDUNG VON GENTECHNISCH HERGESTELLTEN MONOKLONALEN ANTIKÖRPERN, DIE GEGEN TUMOR-IMMUNSUPPRESSIVE FAKTOREN RESISTENT SIND | [2022/45] | English: | COMPOSITION AND USE OF ENGINEERED MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES REFRACTORY TO TUMOR IMMUNO-SUPPRESSIVE FACTORS | [2022/45] | French: | COMPOSITION ET UTILISATION D'ANTICORPS MONOCLONAUX MODIFIÉS RÉFRACTAIRES À DES FACTEURS IMMUNOSUPPRESSEURS TUMORAUX | [2022/45] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 13.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2015141620 (ROBBLEE JOHN [US], et al); |