EP4087077 - ELECTRIC MOTOR CONTROL SYSTEM AND ELECTRIC MOTOR CONTROL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 15.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BYD Company Limited No. 3009, BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DU, Zhiyong No. 3009, BYD Road, Pingshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | 02 /
XU, Luhui No. 3009, BYD Road, Pingshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | 03 /
YU, Yilong No. 3009, BYD Road, Pingshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | 04 /
QI, Axi No. 3009, BYD Road, Pingshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | 05 /
YANG, Guangming No. 3009, BYD Road, Pingshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Dehns Germany Partnerschaft mbB Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/45] | DehnsGermany Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20909205.5 | 25.11.2020 | [2022/45] | WO2020CN131510 | Priority number, date | CN201911409307 | 31.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911409307 | [2022/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021135739 | Date: | 08.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4087077 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H02H7/08, H02P27/08, H02P29/024, H02H7/09, H02H7/093, H02H11/00 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
H02P29/025 (EP);
H02H7/0833 (CN,US);
H02H7/0822 (EP);
H02H7/09 (EP);
H02H7/093 (EP);
H02P27/08 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/45] | H02H7/08, H02P27/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES MOTORSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM UND ELEKTRISCHE MOTORSTEUERVORRICHTUNG | [2022/45] | English: | ELECTRIC MOTOR CONTROL SYSTEM AND ELECTRIC MOTOR CONTROL APPARATUS | [2022/45] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE | [2022/45] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2022 | Translation filed | 28.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 14.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5305215 (BREKKESTRAN KEVIN L [US], et al); | [A]US2015214863 (SUMI MASAKI [JP], et al); | [I]US2016373051 (KUDANOWSKI MACIEJ [GB]) |