EP3990891 - AUTOFOCUS FUNCTIONALITY IN OPTICAL SAMPLE ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 22.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illumina, Inc. 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRINCE, Simon 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, California 92122 / US | 02 /
CONDELLO, Danilo 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, California 92122 / US | 03 /
HSIEH, Vincent 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, California 92122 / US | 04 /
PHOUNSIRI, Krysada 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, California 92122 / US | 05 /
O'SHAUGHNESSY, John 5200 Illumina Way San Diego, California 92122 / US | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/18] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20909529.8 | 22.12.2020 | [2022/18] | WO2020US70951 | Priority number, date | US201962956083P | 31.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962956083 P | US202062959681P | 10.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062959681 P | [2022/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021138633 | Date: | 08.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3990891 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/14, G02B7/32, G01N21/64, G02B21/24 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
G02B7/32 (EP,IL,KR);
G01N21/6458 (EP,IL,KR,US);
G02B21/241 (CN,KR);
G02B21/06 (CN,KR);
G02B21/245 (EP);
G02B27/425 (CN,KR);
G02B5/04 (CN,KR);
G02B7/09 (CN,KR);
G01N2021/058 (IL,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/18] | G01N15/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/18] | Title | German: | AUTOFOKUS-FUNKTIONALITÄT IN DER OPTISCHEN PROBENANALYSE | [2022/18] | English: | AUTOFOCUS FUNCTIONALITY IN OPTICAL SAMPLE ANALYSIS | [2022/18] | French: | FONCTIONNALITÉ DE MISE AU POINT AUTOMATIQUE DANS UNE ANALYSE D'ÉCHANTILLON OPTIQUE | [2022/18] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 18.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2018262670 (CONDELLO DANILO [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-10 * abstract * * Paragraphs [0005], [0061], [0064]-[0065], [0076], [0077]-[0078], [0088]-[0091], [0092]-[0093], [0097]-[0101], [0102]-[0105], [0106]-[0108], [0112]-[0114], [0118]-[0120] * * figures 1-31 * [A] 5,6,11-15; | [XA]EP3376275 (ILLUMINA INC [US]) [X] 1,8 * abstract * * Paragraphs [0005]-[0006], [0018], [0033]-[0040], [0045]-[0047], [0061]-[0062], [0064]-[0066], [0070]-[0072], [0076]-[0078] * * figures 1-31 * [A] 5,6,11-15; | [XA]EP3379319 (ILLUMINA INC [US]) [X] 1,8 * abstract * * Paragraphs [0005]-[0006], [0022], [0025]-[0026], [0037]-[0042], [0049]-[0052], [0064]-[0065], [0067]-[0069], [0073]-[0075], [0079]-[0081] * * figures 1-31 *[A] 5,6,11-15 | International search | [A]WO02091026 (KLA TENCOR CORP [US]) [A] 1-16,18,20-44,46-51 * See the whole document. *; | [A]JP2011514963 (CORNING INC.) [A] 1-16,18,20-44,46-51* See the whole document. *; | [A]US2015054937 (LIPPERT HELMUT [DE], et al) [A] 1-16,18,20-44,46-51 * See paragraphs [0058]-[0092]; figures 1-3. *; | [A]US2016109693 (FENG WENYI [US]) [A] 1-16,18,20-44,46-51 * See paragraphs [0047]-[0102]; figures 1-17B. *; | [A]US2017045457 (RICHARD SIMON [FR], et al) [A] 1-16,18,20-44,46-51 * See paragraphs [0055]-[0166]; figures 1-4. * | by applicant | US2018262670 | EP3376275 | EP3379319 |