EP4087194 - DATA FORWARDING METHOD, FORWARDING DEVICE, SYSTEM, SERVER, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Xiaofei ZTE Plaza Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
XI, Yuanyuan ZTE Plaza Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Deambrogi, Edgardo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 20910169.0 | 01.12.2020 | [2022/45] | WO2020CN133149 | Priority number, date | CN201911396100 | 30.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911396100 | [2022/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021135792 | Date: | 08.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4087194 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/46 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
H04L12/4666 (EP);
H04L12/4641 (EP,CN);
H04L45/00 (EP);
H04L45/306 (EP);
H04L45/50 (EP);
H04L45/74 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM, SERVER UND SPEICHERMEDIUM ZUR WEITERLEITUNG VON DATEN | [2022/45] | English: | DATA FORWARDING METHOD, FORWARDING DEVICE, SYSTEM, SERVER, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFERT DE DONNÉES, DISPOSITIF DE TRANSFERT, SYSTÈME, SERVEUR ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2022/45] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2022 | Translation filed | 29.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 15.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US9774824 (BRADY FINBARR ANDREW [IE], et al) [A] 1-11 * figures 1, 11, 13A * * column 2, line 48 - line 65 * * column 4, line 34 - line 56 ** column 5, line 34 - line 59 *; | [X]US2018359323 (MADDEN STEPHEN ANTHONY [US]) [X] 1-11 * figures 1, 2B, 4, 6 * * page 1, paragraph 8 * * page 3, paragraph 27 * * page 5, paragraph 42 * * page 9, paragraph 69 * * page 11, paragraph 88 *; | [A]US10411985 (MILLER KEVIN CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * figures 1, 2 * * column 3, line 45 - line 64 * * column 4, line 23 - line 51 * * column 6, line 37 - line 58 * |