EP4084801 - A NOVEL VISCOELASTIC FORMULATION FOR OSTEOARTHRITIS TREATMENT AND A PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VSY Biyoteknoloji Ve Ilac Sanayi Anonim Sirketi Istanbul Tuzla Organize Sanayi Bölgesi 3. Cadde, No:3 Tepeoren Mevkii Istanbul / TR | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OYTUN, Faruk ITOSB 3 Cadde No:3 Tepeoren Tuzla/Istanbul / TR | 02 /
KAYA, Busra Gizem Istanbul Teknik Universitesi Fen-Edebiyat Fakultesi Kimya Bl. 34469 Sariyer/Istanbul / TR | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Dericioglu, E. Korhan Ankara Patent Bureau Mustafa Kemal Mahallesi Dumlupinar Bulvari Eskisehir Yolu 9.km No:274/7 B Blok 14. Kat No:161 06530 Cankaya, Ankara / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/45] | Dericioglu, E. Korhan Ankara Patent Bureau Kavaklidere Mah. Bestekar Cad. No: 12/11 06680 Cankaya, Ankara / TR | Application number, filing date | 20910352.2 | 31.12.2020 | [2022/45] | WO2020TR51471 | Priority number, date | TR20190022907 | 31.12.2019 Original published format: TR 201922907 | [2022/45] | Filing language | TR | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021137837 | Date: | 08.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4084801 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | TR | 08.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/728, A61K31/737, A61P19/02 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
C08L5/08 (EP);
A61K31/728 (EP);
A61K31/737 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
C08B37/0072 (EP);
C08J3/075 (EP);
C08J2305/08 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/728, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/737, A61K2300/00 (EP);
C08L5/08, C08L5/08, C08L5/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE VISKOELASTISCHE FORMULIERUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON OSTEOARTHRITIS UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2022/45] | English: | A NOVEL VISCOELASTIC FORMULATION FOR OSTEOARTHRITIS TREATMENT AND A PRODUCTION METHOD THEREOF | [2022/45] | French: | NOUVELLE FORMULATION VISCOÉLASTIQUE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE L'ARTHROSE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2022/45] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2009143331 (STROUMPOULIS DIMITRIOS [US], et al); | [Y]US2013136780 (TEZEL AHMET [US], et al); | [Y]EP3257549 (ENDO DERMA CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR20180035032 (PHARMARESEARCH PROD CO LTD [KR]); | [XY]EP3473242 (ENDO DERMA CO LTD [KR]) | International search | [Y]WO9704012 (AAGERUP BENGT [SE]) [Y] 6-12 * abstract, examples 1, 3, 9, claim 12 *; | [A]US2009143331 (STROUMPOULIS DIMITRIOS [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract, claim 20 *; | [XY]WO2013144867 (FIDIA FARMACEUTICI [IT]) [X] 1-5 * abstract, page 5 lines 25-30, page 6 lines 27-30, page 8 lines 20-29, page 9 lines 27-31, page 10 lines 1-20, 29-31, page 11 lines 1-5, page 13 lines 14-27, claims 1, 2, 12, 13 * [Y] 6-12; | [A]EP3081232 (NEW MEDIC CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-12* abstract, paragraphs 6-8, 15 * |