EP4085196 - SCALABLE SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ASSESSING HEALTHY CONDITION SCORES IN RENEWABLE ASSET MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Utopus Insights, Inc. 117 East Stevens Avenue Suite 200 Valhalla, NY 10595 / US | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VISWESWARIAH, Chandu 117 E. Stevens Avenue Suite 200 Valhalla, New York 10595 / US | 02 /
TOGHILL, Lars 117 E. Stevens Avenue Suite 200 Valhalla, New York 10595 / US | 03 /
IGBA, Joel 117 E. Stevens Avenue Suite 200 Valhalla, New York 10595 / US | 04 /
DESAI, Neil 117 E. Stevens Avenue Suite 200 Valhalla, New York 10595 / US | 05 /
KIM, Younghun 32 Brookside Place Pleasantville, New York 10570 / US | 06 /
WANG, Yajuan 54 Greenvale Circle White Plains, New York 10607 / US | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 20910911.5 | 30.12.2020 | [2022/45] | WO2020US67578 | Priority number, date | US201962955403P | 30.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962955403 P | [2022/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021138500 | Date: | 08.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4085196 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02, G06F18/21, G06F18/241, G06F18/25, G06N3/044, H02J3/00, G06F18/214, G06F18/2413, G06N3/045, H02J3/38 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
G05B23/0283 (EP,US);
G05B23/0227 (US);
G05B23/0243 (EP);
G06F18/214 (EP,US);
G06F18/217 (EP);
G06F18/2413 (EP);
G06F18/251 (EP);
G06N20/00 (US);
G06N3/044 (EP);
G06N3/045 (EP);
H02J3/001 (EP,US);
H02J3/381 (EP);
G05B2219/2619 (EP);
H02J2203/20 (EP);
H02J2300/28 (EP,US);
Y02E10/76 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/45] | F03D17/00, F03D7/04, G01D18/00, G06N3/08, G06N5/02, G06N20/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Title | German: | SKALIERBARE SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEWERTUNG VON GESUNDHEITSZUSTANDSSCORES BEIM MANAGEMENT ERNEUERBARER ASSETS | [2022/45] | English: | SCALABLE SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ASSESSING HEALTHY CONDITION SCORES IN RENEWABLE ASSET MANAGEMENT | [2022/45] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS ÉVOLUTIFS POUR ÉVALUER DES SCORES DE CONDITIONS SAINES DANS UNE GESTION D'ACTIFS RENOUVELABLES | [2022/45] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 26.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011020122 (PARTHASARATHY GIRIJA [US], et al); | [Y]US2011313726 (PARTHASARATHY GIRIJA [US], et al); | [Y]US2018223812 (BADRINATH KRISHNA VARUN [US], et al); | [IY]WO2018228648 (KK WIND SOLUTIONS AS [DK]); | [Y]US2019003929 (SHAPIRO STEPHANIE [US], et al) | International search | [A]US2011313726 (PARTHASARATHY GIRIJA [US], et al); | [A]US2017310483 (NAGAO YUTAKA [US], et al); | [Y]US2018223812 (BADRINATH KRISHNA VARUN [US], et al); | [XY]WO2018228648 (KK WIND SOLUTIONS AS [DK]); | [A]US2019236456 (KIM YOUNGHUN [US], et al); | [PA]US2020049129 (GIRARDOT ANDRES F [US], et al) | by applicant | US2011020122 | US2011313726 | US2018223812 | WO2018228648 | US2019003929 |