EP4085619 - METHOD FOR LAYERWISE RANDOM ACCESS IN A CODED VIDEO STREAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent America LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2022/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Byeongdoo c/o Tencent America LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto California 94306 / US | 02 /
LIU, Shan c/o Tencent America LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto California 94306 / US | 03 /
WENGER, Stephan c/o Tencent America LLC 2747 Park Boulevard Palo Alto California 94306 / US | [2022/45] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2022/45] | Application number, filing date | 20911223.4 | 09.10.2020 | [2022/45] | WO2020US54972 | Priority number, date | US201962954880P | 30.12.2019 Original published format: US 201962954880 P | US202017063082 | 05.10.2020 Original published format: US202017063082 | [2022/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021137915 | Date: | 08.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4085619 | Date: | 09.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/105, H04N19/159, H04N19/172, H04N19/187, H04N19/30, H04N19/70 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
H04N19/30 (EP,KR);
H04N19/46 (US);
H04N19/129 (US);
H04N19/159 (US);
H04N19/172 (KR,US);
H04N19/188 (KR,US);
H04N19/70 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/45] | H04N19/105, H04N19/159, H04N19/172, H04N19/187, H04N19/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SCHICHTWEISEN DIREKTZUGRIFF IN EINEM CODIERTEN VIDEOSTROM | [2022/45] | English: | METHOD FOR LAYERWISE RANDOM ACCESS IN A CODED VIDEO STREAM | [2022/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE PAR COUCHES DANS UN FLUX VIDÉO CODÉ | [2022/45] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 09.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/45] | 22.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015271506 (HENDRY FNU [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2014301485 (RAMASUBRAMONIAN ADARSH KRISHNAN [US], et al); | [A]US2014301437 (WANG YE-KUI [US]); | [A]US2015271506 (HENDRY FNU [US], et al); | [A]US2016088306 (SJÖBERG RICKARD [SE], et al); | [A]US2017105004 (CHEN YING [US], et al); |