EP4089628 - SIGHT LINE ESTIMATION DEVICE, SIGHT LINE ESTIMATION METHOD, MODEL GENERATION DEVICE, AND MODEL GENERATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2022/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEUCHI, Yamato c/o OMRON Corporation, 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 02 /
NAGAE, Shigenori c/o OMRON Corporation, 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 03 /
AOI, Hatsumi c/o OMRON Corporation, 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 04 /
YAMAMOTO, Kazuo c/o OMRON Corporation, 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/46] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Ganghoferstraße 29a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20911379.4 | 10.01.2020 | [2022/46] | WO2020JP00643 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021140642 | Date: | 15.07.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4089628 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/70, G06N3/04, G06V40/00 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
G06T7/70 (EP);
G06V40/193 (US);
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06N3/0464 (EP);
G06N3/09 (EP);
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
G06V10/993 (US);
G06V40/18 (EP);
G06N3/084 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/46] | G06T7/00, G06T7/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SICHTLINIENSCHÄTZUNG, MODELLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND MODELLERZEUGUNGSVERFAHREN | [2022/46] | English: | SIGHT LINE ESTIMATION DEVICE, SIGHT LINE ESTIMATION METHOD, MODEL GENERATION DEVICE, AND MODEL GENERATION METHOD | [2022/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ESTIMATION DE LIGNE DE VISÉE, PROCÉDÉ D'ESTIMATION DE LIGNE DE VISÉE, DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION DE MODÈLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION DE MODÈLE | [2022/46] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2022 | Translation filed | 28.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 19.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2019154511 (PUPIL LABS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [00229] * * paragraph [00334] - paragraph [00348] *; | [XI]US2019303724 (LINDEN ERIK [SE]) [X] 1-10,12-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0109] * * paragraph [0075] * * page 6; figures 6,7,14 * [I] 11; | [XI] - ERIK LIND\'EN ET AL, "Learning to Personalize in Appearance-Based Gaze Tracking", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20180702), XP081491350 [X] 1-10,12-15 * abstract * * bridging paragraph; page 1, column right - page 2, column left * * Section 3. The SPAZE method; page 3, column left - page 5, column right * * figure 1 * [I] 11 | International search | [A]JP2019028843 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [A] 1-15 * , entire text, all drawings *; | [A]US2019303724 (LINDEN ERIK [SE]) [A] 1-15* , entire text, all drawings * | by applicant | JP2019028843 |