EP4087583 - ARGINASE INHIBITORS AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | [2022/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ACHAB, Abdelghani Abe 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 02 /
CHILDERS, Matthew, L. 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 03 /
FISCHER, Christian 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 04 /
GATHIAKA, Symon 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 05 /
LI, Derun 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 06 /
LU, Min 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 07 /
PALANI, Anandan 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 08 /
PALTE, Rachel, L. 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 09 /
PU, Qinglin 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 10 /
SLOMAN, David, L. 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 11 /
ZHANG, Hongjun 254 Park Street Boston, Massachusetts 02132 / US | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC 120 Moorgate London EC2M 6UR / GB | [2022/46] | Application number, filing date | 20911563.3 | 18.12.2020 | [2022/46] | WO2020US65798 | Priority number, date | US202062958056P | 07.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062958056 P | [2022/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021141751 | Date: | 15.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4087583 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/69, A61P35/00, C07F5/02, A61K45/06 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
C07F5/025 (EP,US);
A61K31/69 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/69, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/46] | A61K31/69, A61P35/00, C07F5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] | Title | German: | ARGINASE-INHIBITOREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2022/46] | English: | ARGINASE INHIBITORS AND METHODS OF USE | [2022/46] | French: | INHIBITEURS D'ARGINASE ET MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION | [2022/46] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 08.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 11.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP3034509 (MARS INC [US]) [X] 1-7,17-21 * page 2, paragraph 0006 * * page 11; compound 11 * * page 12; compound 24 *; | [X]WO2017075363 (CALITHERA BIOSCIENCES INC [US]) [X] 1-7,17-21 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 83; claim 36 *; | [X]WO2019177873 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [X] 1-7,17-21 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 261; example 9 *; | [XI]WO2019245890 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10,13,15-21 * page 86, paragraph 1 * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 88, paragraph 5 * * page 88, paragraph 3 * * page 89, paragraph 2 * * page 86, paragraph 5 * * page 6; compound I * * page 64; compound IV * * page 65; compound V * * page 68; compound VI * * page 84; compound VII *[I] 11,12,14; | [E]EP3897622 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US]) [E] 1-9,17-21 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 101; claims 35,36 * | International search | [A]US2017121352 (SJOGREN ERIC B [US], et al) [A] 1-3* ; entire document *; | [A]US2017319536 (BLASZCZYK ROMAN [PL], et al) [A] 1-3 * ; entire document *; | [A]WO2019177873 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * ; p66 *; | [A] - "1,2-Dioxaspiro[4.5]dec-7-en-4-ylboronic acid", PubChem Compound, U.S. National Library of Medicine, (20120212), Database accession no. CID 87392280, URL: ncbi, XP055840762 [A] 1-3 * ; p2 * | [A] - ERB et al., "An Easy Route to (Hetero)arylboronic Acids", Chemistry A European Journal, (20140526), vol. 20, no. 22, pages 6608 - 6612, XP055840759 [A] 1-3 * ; p6611 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chem.201402487 |