EP4070885 - HYDROCARBON REFORMING CATALYST AND HYDROCARBON REFORMING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 04.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Hideto c/o Murata Manufacturing Co.,Ltd., 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Frick, Robert Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 20912112.8 | 04.11.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020JP41152 | Priority number, date | JP20200000916 | 07.01.2020 Original published format: JP 2020000916 | [2022/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021140733 | Date: | 15.07.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4070885 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/63, B01J23/58, B01J27/232, B01J23/00, B01J35/02, B01J37/00, B01J37/08, C01B3/40 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
B01J23/002 (EP,US);
B01J23/462 (US);
B01J23/63 (EP);
B01J35/40 (EP);
B01J37/0009 (EP);
B01J37/088 (EP);
C01B3/40 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00 (EP);
B01J2523/24 (US);
B01J2523/36 (US);
B01J2523/3712 (US);
B01J2523/48 (US);
C01B2203/0233 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0238 (EP);
C01B2203/1064 (EP);
Y02P20/52 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/24, B01J2523/36, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/48, B01J2523/821 (EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/24, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/48, B01J2523/821 (EP) |
Former IPC [2022/41] | B01J23/63, B01J23/58, B01J27/232, C01B3/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Title | German: | KOHLENWASSERSTOFFREFORMIERUNGSKATALYSATOR UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KOHLENWASSERSTOFFREFORMIERUNG | [2022/41] | English: | HYDROCARBON REFORMING CATALYST AND HYDROCARBON REFORMING DEVICE | [2022/41] | French: | CATALYSEUR DE REFORMAGE D'HYDROCARBURES ET DISPOSITIF DE REFORMAGE D'HYDROCARBURES | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2022 | Translation filed | 04.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 04.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0780310 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO); | [A]JP2003190792 (TEIKOKU OIL, et al); | [A]WO2011027727 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP], et al); | [A]JP2013237049 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP) | by applicant | JPH08231204 | JPH09168740 | JP2006346598 | JP2015136668 |