EP4075594 - ANTENNA ASSEMBLY AND MOBILE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Yuan Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
YU, Dong Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Hanyang Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
HOU, Meng Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/42] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20912301.7 | 10.12.2020 | [2022/42] | WO2020CN135115 | Priority number, date | CN20201019331 | 08.01.2020 Original published format: CN202010019331 | [2022/42] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021139473 | Date: | 15.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4075594 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H01Q5/35, H01Q13/10, H01Q5/335 | [2023/04] | CPC: |
H01Q1/243 (EP);
H01Q1/36 (CN);
H01Q5/50 (CN,US);
H01Q1/22 (CN,US);
H01Q1/48 (CN,US);
H01Q1/50 (CN,US);
H01Q13/10 (EP);
H01Q21/0006 (CN);
H01Q5/10 (CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/42] | H01Q1/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Title | German: | ANTENNENANORDNUNG UND MOBILES ENDGERÄT | [2022/42] | English: | ANTENNA ASSEMBLY AND MOBILE TERMINAL | [2022/42] | French: | ENSEMBLE ANTENNE ET TERMINAL MOBILE | [2022/42] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2022 | Translation filed | 12.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 24.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2017077603 (KROGERUS JOONAS [FI]); | [XAI]CN107039766 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [XAI]US2018048049 (TOIVANEN JALMARI [FI]); | [A]CN110061349 (UNIV TSINGHUA) |