EP4089946 - INFORMATION ACQUISITION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Yong ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
WU, Hao ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
ZHENG, Guozeng ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
LU, Zhaohua ZTE Plaza, Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park, Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2022/46] | Application number, filing date | 20912325.6 | 30.12.2020 | [2022/46] | WO2020CN141220 | Priority number, date | CN20201014775 | 07.01.2020 Original published format: CN202010014775 | [2022/46] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021139577 | Date: | 15.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4089946 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04L1/00, H04B17/309, H04J11/00 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
H04B17/309 (EP,CN);
H04L5/0048 (EP,CN,US);
H04B7/0626 (US);
H04J11/0079 (EP);
H04L1/0026 (CN);
H04L1/0027 (CN);
H04L5/0026 (EP);
H04L5/0091 (EP);
H04L5/0094 (CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/46] | H04L5/00, H04L1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSERFASSUNGSVERFAHREN UND -GERÄT SOWIE VORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/46] | English: | INFORMATION ACQUISITION METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ACQUISITION D'INFORMATIONS, ET DISPOSITIF ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2022/46] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2022 | Translation filed | 03.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 01.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2018115357 (PARK JONGHYUN [KR], et al) [X] 1,13,14 * paragraphs [0430] - [0575] *[I] 2-12; | [XI]US2019260448 (RAHMAN MD SAIFUR [US], et al) [X] 1,13,14 * paragraphs [0091] - [0157] * * paragraphs [0163] - [0249] * [I] 2-12 |