EP3931778 - PERSONAL INFORMATION MANAGEMENT DEVICE, SYSTEM, METHOD AND COMPUTER-READABLE NON-TRANSITORY MEDIUM THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SNPLAB INC. Hanyang Institute of Technology 222, Wangsimni-ro Seongdong-gu Seoul 04763 / KR | [2022/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jae Young 105-105, 120, Irwon-ro, Gangnam-gu Seoul 06356 / KR | [2024/06] |
Former [2022/01] | 01 /
LEE, Jae Young Seoul 06356 / KR | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2022/01] | Application number, filing date | 20912744.8 | 18.11.2020 | [2022/01] | WO2020KR16302 | Priority number, date | KR20200001595 | 06.01.2020 Original published format: KR 20200001595 | KR20200025472 | 28.02.2020 Original published format: KR 20200025472 | [2022/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021141235 | Date: | 15.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3931778 | Date: | 05.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3931778 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/10, H04L9/00, G06F3/0488, G06F3/04847, G06F21/64, G06F21/62 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
G06F21/64 (EP,CN);
G06Q10/04 (KR);
G06Q20/382 (CN);
G06F21/6245 (US);
G06F16/27 (CN);
G06F21/602 (CN);
G06F21/6254 (EP);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06F3/04847 (EP);
G06F3/0488 (EP);
G06F3/04883 (US);
G06Q10/10 (KR);
G06Q20/065 (CN);
G06Q20/10 (CN);
G06Q40/00 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/49] | G06Q10/10, H04L9/00 | ||
Former IPC [2022/01] | G06Q10/10, H04L29/08, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM, VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG PERSÖNLICHER INFORMATIONEN SOWIE COMPUTERLESBARES NICHTFLÜCHTIGES MEDIUM DAFÜR | [2022/01] | English: | PERSONAL INFORMATION MANAGEMENT DEVICE, SYSTEM, METHOD AND COMPUTER-READABLE NON-TRANSITORY MEDIUM THEREFOR | [2022/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION D'INFORMATIONS PERSONNELLES, ET SUPPORT NON TRANSITOIRE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR ASSOCIÉ | [2022/01] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 22.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IS | 07.06.2024 | [2024/32] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010088743 (HAYASHIDA NAOKO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0065] *; | [A]US2018307859 (LAFEVER MALCOLM GARY [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0374] *; | [XAI]WO2019089044 (VISA INT SERVICE CORPORATION [US]) [X] 1-4,6-11,13,14 * Passages are specified in respect to US family member. * [A] 5,12 [I] 15; | [P]US2020311299 (AMAR SUMIT [US]) [P] * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0111] * * paragraph [0109] * * paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0078] * | International search | [Y]KR20100060130 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0018]-[0023] and claims 1-2. *; | [Y]US2010306834 (GRANDISON TYRONE W A [US], et al) [Y] 15 * See paragraphs [0038]-[0040],[0044]-[0046] and claims 1,7. *; | [A]US2013185206 (LEGGETT JACQUELLE DEQUAN [US], et al) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0023]-[0027] and claims 1,6. *; | [Y]WO2018049318 (SENSORIANT INC [US]) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0165],[0228],[0274]. *; | [A]KR20200000161 (BLOCK CHAIN SECURITY COOP [KR]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0017]-[0022] and claim 1. * | by applicant | US2020311299 |