EP4092397 - OPTICAL FILTER ARRAY, OPTICAL DETECTION DEVICE, AND OPTICAL DETECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 11.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/47] | For all designated states PANASONIC INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY MANAGEMENT CO., LTD. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIKAWA Atsushi Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
INADA Yasuhisa Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
HISADA Kazuya Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 20914325.4 | 06.11.2020 | [2022/47] | WO2020JP41439 | Priority number, date | JP20200005094 | 16.01.2020 Original published format: JP 2020005094 | [2022/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021145054 | Date: | 22.07.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4092397 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/26, G01J3/28, G02B5/28, H01L27/146 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
H01L27/14621 (EP,US);
G01N21/31 (CN);
H04N25/136 (US);
G01J3/26 (US);
G01J3/2823 (EP);
G01N21/01 (CN);
G01N21/255 (CN);
G02B27/0012 (CN);
G02B5/201 (CN);
G02B5/28 (EP);
G03B11/00 (CN);
H01L27/14645 (EP,US);
G01J2003/2806 (EP);
G01J2003/2813 (EP);
G01J2003/2826 (EP);
G01N2021/0112 (CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/47] | G01J1/04, G01J1/38, G01J3/26, G01J3/36, G01J3/51, G02B5/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE FILTERANORDNUNG, VORRICHTUNG ZUR OPTISCHEN DETEKTION UND SYSTEM ZUR OPTISCHEN DETEKTION | [2022/47] | English: | OPTICAL FILTER ARRAY, OPTICAL DETECTION DEVICE, AND OPTICAL DETECTION SYSTEM | [2022/47] | French: | RÉSEAU DE FILTRES OPTIQUES, DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION OPTIQUE ET SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION OPTIQUE | [2022/47] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2021 | Translation filed | 25.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 10.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/47] | 08.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008042782 (WANG SHAOWEI [CN], et al) [X] 1-9 * figure 3a *; | [X]US2015015692 (SMART ANTHONY [US]) [X] 1-9 * figure 5 *; | [X]US2017010160 (ROSEN SAGEE [IL], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9* figure 6 *; | [X]US2017276996 (BARBOUR RUSSELL J [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * figures 3, 5 *; | [X]US2017309758 (FREY LAURENT [FR], et al) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0056]; figure 2c * | International search | [A]JP2016156801 (PANASONIC IP MAN CORP)[A] 1-9; | [A]JP2018164153 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1-9; | [A]WO2018213923 (10103560 CANADA LTD [CA]) [A] 1-9; | [A]JP2019114602 (SONY SEMICONDUCTOR SOLUTIONS CORP) [A] 1-9; | [A]JP2019220176 (RES ORGANIZATION OF INFORMATION & SYSTEMS) [A] 1-9 | by applicant | US2016138975 | JP2016100703 |