Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
11.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
10.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
29.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.11.2023 | Supplementary search report | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
17.11.2023 | Change - classification | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
17.11.2023 | Change - classification | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
17.03.2023 | Change: Validation states | published on 19.04.2023 [2023/16] |
17.03.2023 | Change - extension states | published on 19.04.2023 [2023/16] |
30.12.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.08.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
12.08.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
12.07.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
09.06.2022 | Change - representative | |
09.06.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.05.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
23.07.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.07.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |