EP4074482 - SCREW, EXTRUDER, AND EXTRUSION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nakata Engineering Co., Ltd. 619 Kandechominami Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2312 / JP | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO Tadasuke c/o Nakata Engineering Co., Ltd., 619 Kandechominami, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2312 / JP | 02 /
NODA Makoto c/o Nakata Engineering Co., Ltd., 619 Kandechominami, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2312 / JP | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2022/42] | Application number, filing date | 20914811.3 | 24.09.2020 | [2022/42] | WO2020JP36056 | Priority number, date | JP20200008850 | 23.01.2020 Original published format: JP 2020008850 | [2022/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021149304 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4074482 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B29B7/42, B29C48/66, B29C48/685, B29C48/00, B29C48/08, B29K21/00 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
B29B7/422 (EP);
B29C48/66 (EP,KR,US);
B29B7/42 (KR);
B29B7/429 (EP);
B29C48/022 (EP,KR);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B29C48/59 (US);
B29C48/595 (KR);
B29C48/68 (KR);
B29C48/681 (EP,US);
B29C48/685 (KR);
B29C48/687 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/42] | B29B7/42, B29C48/66, B29C48/685 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Title | German: | SCHNECKE, EXTRUDER UND EXTRUSIONSVERFAHREN | [2022/42] | English: | SCREW, EXTRUDER, AND EXTRUSION METHOD | [2022/42] | French: | VIS, EXTRUDEUSE ET PROCÉDÉ D'EXTRUSION | [2022/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2022 | Translation filed | 11.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 29.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5889341 (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * , page 2, upper left column, 6-16, page 2, lower right column, line 6 to page 3, upper left column, line 16, fig. 1-9 *; | [A]JPS63122513 (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * , page 2, lower right column, lines 2-11 *; | [A]JPH0515369B (NISSEI PLASTICS IND CO.) [A] 1-8 * , page 2, right column, lines 2-7, left column, lines 3-9, page 2, left column, line 38 to right column, line 1 *; | [A]JPH05309720 (UBE INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-8 * , paragraph [0014], fig. 3 *; | [A]JPH081738 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0004], [0021]-[0026], [0028], fig. 3, 4 *; | [A]CN104589618B (ANHUI PURUISI ELECTRICAL MACHINERY CO., LTD.) [A] 1-8* , paragraph [0028], fig. 2 *; | [A]JP2019119050 (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [A] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0009], [0012] * | by applicant | JP2019043043 |