EP4094749 - THICKENER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 22.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1 Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-3-18, Nakanoshima Kita-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8288 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/48] | For all designated states National Institute Of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1 Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | ||
For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-3-18, Nakanoshima Kita-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8288 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IMURA, Tomohiro c/o National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology, Tsukuba Central 1, 1-1 Umezono 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8560 / JP | 02 /
TAIRA, Toshiaki c/o National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology, Tsukuba Central 1, 1-1 Umezono 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-8560 / JP | 03 /
TSUJI, Tadao c/o KANEKA CORPORATION, 5-1-1, Torikainishi Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-0072 / JP | 04 /
YANAGISAWA, Satohiro c/o KANEKA CORPORATION, 1-12-32, Akasaka, Minato- ku Tokyo 107-6028 / JP | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/48] | Application number, filing date | 20915198.4 | 11.11.2020 | [2022/48] | WO2020JP42040 | Priority number, date | JP20200008230 | 22.01.2020 Original published format: JP 2020008230 | [2022/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021149334 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4094749 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/00, A61K8/55, A61K8/64, A61K47/24, A61K47/42 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
A61K8/64 (EP,US);
A61K8/553 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
A61Q19/007 (US);
A61K2800/10 (EP);
A61K2800/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | VERDICKUNGSMITTEL | [2022/48] | English: | THICKENER | [2022/48] | French: | ÉPAISSISSANT | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2022 | Translation filed | 11.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 22.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2004256471 (KANEBO LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * Example * * example 22 * [Y] 1-16; | [XY]KR100452165B (AMOREPACIFIC CORP [KR]) [X] 1-6 * page 4 * [Y] 1-16; | [IY]JP2008069075 (KRACIE HOME PRODUCTS KK) [I] 1-6 * paragraphs [0006] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0011] - [0012] * * paragraphs [0021] - [0022] * * example 22 * [Y] 1-16; | [XY]WO2017104734 (POLA CHEM IND INC [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-8,10-13,15,16 * page 1, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 8, paragraphs 25,26 * * page 9, paragraphs 29-30; claim 8 * * page 13, paragraph 38 * * claim 16 * [Y] 1-16; | [XP]WO2020162103 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [XP] 1-16 * page 9, paragraph 44 * * page 10, paragraph 48 * * Test Example 1 *; | [XY] - anonymous, "Perfect Solution Soothing Mask", GNPD, MINTEL, (20220722), Database accession no. 9764484, URL: https://www.gnpd.com/sinatra/recordpage/9764484/, XP093118480 [X] 1,3,5,6 * abstract * [Y] 1-16 | [A] - CARRILLO C ET AL, "Molecular mechanism of membrane permeabilization by the peptide antibiotic surfactin", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20030401), vol. 1611, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/S0005-2736(03)00029-4, ISSN 0005-2736, pages 91 - 97, XP004416796 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0005-2736(03)00029-4 | International search | [A]JP2008069075 (KRACIE HOME PRODUCTS KK)[A] 1-16; | [A]WO2018181538 (KANEKA CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 | by applicant | JPH11241060 | JP2020008230 |