EP4096292 - CELL RESELECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS, INFORMATION TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS, COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIANG, Xiaowei No.018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33, Middle Xierqi Road, Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/48] | Representative(s) | Dehns Germany Partnerschaft mbB Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/48] | Kudlek, Franz Thomas Dehns Germany Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20915925.0 | 20.01.2020 | [2022/48] | WO2020CN73276 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021146852 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4096292 | Date: | 30.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/18, // H04W48/12 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
H04W48/18 (EP);
H04W36/0061 (CN);
H04W36/06 (US);
H04W36/0072 (EP,CN,US);
H04W36/13 (EP,CN,US);
H04W36/302 (EP,CN,US);
H04W48/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/48] | H04W36/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/48] | Title | German: | ZELLENNEUWAHLVERFAHREN UND -GERÄT, INFORMATIONSÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND -GERÄT, KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/48] | English: | CELL RESELECTION METHOD AND APPARATUS, INFORMATION TRANSMISSION METHOD AND APPARATUS, COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RESÉLECTION DE CELLULE, PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS, DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE | [2022/48] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2022 | Translation filed | 19.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/48] | 31.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2018228294 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [X]EP3534649 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD [CN]); | [IY]EP3589016 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | EP3627863 [ ] (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | International search | [X]CN108513322 (TELECOMMUNICATIONS SCIENCE & TECH RESEARCH INST CO LTD); | [A]WO2019064274 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [X]CN109831807 (CHINA ACADEMY TELECOMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY); |