EP4080375 - PCIE-BASED DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAN, Lei Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
BAO, Pengxin Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20916055.5 | 22.01.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020CN73921 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021147046 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4080375 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/42, H04L9/40 | [2022/51] | CPC: |
G06F13/4282 (EP);
G06F13/4221 (US);
G06F13/4295 (EP);
G06F2213/0026 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/43] | G06F13/42, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | AUF PCIE BASIERENDES DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG | [2022/43] | English: | PCIE-BASED DATA TRANSMISSION METHOD AND DEVICE | [2022/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES À BASE DE PCIE | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2022 | Translation filed | 21.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2022 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 12.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2015016882 (INTEL CORP [US]); | [A]US9280290 (FEEHRER JOHN R [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2013259053 (SATO MITSURU [DE]); | [A]CN108471384 (BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCI & TEC); | [A]CN109410117 (INVENTEC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al); | [A]US10445280 (COSBY DAVID W [US], et al) |